Hughes et al v. Three Forks Regional Jail et al

Defendant: Harvey Pelfrey, Wolfe County, Kentucky, John Doe(s), Three Forks Regional Jail, Owsley County, Kentucky and Lee County, Kentucky
Undetermined: Jennifer Smith and Kimberly Hughes
Case Number: 5:2019cv00033
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
0 Judge: P SO
1 Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review: re #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Lee County, Kentucky, Owsley County, Kentucky, Harvey Pelfrey, Harvey Pelfrey, Three Forks Regional Jail, Wolfe County, Kentucky (KM)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Lee County, Kentucky, Owsley County, Kentucky, Harvey Pelfrey, Harvey Pelfrey, Three Forks Regional Jail, Wolfe County, Kentucky filed by Lee County, Kentucky, Owsley County, Kentucky, Harvey Pelfrey, Harvey Pelfrey, Three Forks Regional Jail, Wolfe County, Kentucky. (Miller, Lyndol)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Lee County, Kentucky, Owsley County, Kentucky, Harvey Pelfrey, Harvey Pelfrey, Three Forks Regional Jail, Wolfe County, Kentucky filed by Kimberly Hughes, Jennifer Smith. (Pillersdorf, Ned)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Lee County, Kentucky, Owsley County, Kentucky, Harvey Pelfrey, Harvey Pelfrey, Three Forks Regional Jail, Wolfe County, Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Miller, Lyndol)
February 20, 2019 Case no longer referred to PSO, per Chambers. (KM)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lee County, Kentucky, Owsley County, Kentucky, Harvey Pelfrey, Harvey Pelfrey, Three Forks Regional Jail, Wolfe County, Kentucky; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KM)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING by Kimberly Hughes, Jennifer Smith (Attachments: #1 Summons Three Forks Regional Jail, #2 Summons Harvey Pelfrey, #3 Summons Lee County, #4 Summons Owlsey County, #5 Summons Wolfe County)(Pillersdorf, Ned) Modified text on 2/6/2019 (KM).
February 5, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Ned Pillersdorf re #1 Complaint; attorney notifiedclerk the summons should be returned electronically; however, aprepared summons was not attached to the electronic filing of the complaint inthe fictitious miscellaneous case number 19-99999. A summons may beissued by presenting the prepared summons to the Clerk for issuance onpaper or by electronically filing a document entitled Notice of Filing with theprepared summons as an attachment within 7 calendar days. cc: COR (KM)
February 4, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred) (KM)
February 4, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KM)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (0 summons presented) referred to PSO. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4276518.), filed by Jennifer Smith, Kimberly Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes et al v. Three Forks Regional Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Pelfrey
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Represented By: Derrick T. Wright
Represented By: Janet Shilan Luo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolfe County, Kentucky
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Represented By: Derrick T. Wright
Represented By: Janet Shilan Luo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Forks Regional Jail
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Represented By: Derrick T. Wright
Represented By: Janet Shilan Luo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owsley County, Kentucky
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Represented By: Derrick T. Wright
Represented By: Janet Shilan Luo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee County, Kentucky
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Represented By: Derrick T. Wright
Represented By: Janet Shilan Luo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Jennifer Smith
Represented By: Ned Pillersdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Kimberly Hughes
Represented By: Ned Pillersdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?