Tecossl, Inc v. Avid Labs, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tecossl, Inc
Defendant: Patrick Bates, Techmatic Inc. and Avid Labs, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00043
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AGREED ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #13 Parties' Joint Motion to extend the current deadline for Defendant Avid Labs, LLC to file their responsive pleading to the Complaint filed in this above-styled matter until April 19, 2019, be, and is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/1/19.(JLM)cc: COR
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Avid Labs, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Order)(Graves, Trevor)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tecossl, Inc via certified mail through the Secretary of State to Techmatic Inc. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 certified mail receipt)(KJR)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to Avid Labs, LLC COMPLETED on 3/25/2019. Secretary of State return states Served Avid Labs, LLC via Certified Mail, return receipt on 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Signed Green Card)(KM)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Patrick Bates, Techmatic Inc.; Summons issued and service packet returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Secretary of State. (KM)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING by Tecossl, Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons to Patrick Bates, #2 Summons to Techmatic Inc.)(Francis, James)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Avid Labs, LLC; Summons issued and service packet returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Secretary of State. (KM) Modified text on 3/5/2019 (KM).
March 4, 2019 Clerk's Note re #7 Summons Returned Unexecuted and Request for Reissue: Clerk spoke to attorney and requested new summons be filed into the record as to defendants Techmatic Inc. and Patrick Bates so summons could reissued. (KM)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted and Request for Reissue by Tecossl, Inc as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons not served, #2 Summons to Avid Labs LLC)(Francis, James) Modified text on 3/4/2019 (KM).
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tecossl, Inc. (Francis, James)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, James M. Francis. #1 Complaint, has been filed by Tecossl, Inc without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KM)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent re #1 Complaint. cc: form e-mailed to Register. (KM)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Avid Labs, LLC, Patrick Bates, Techmatic Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KM)
February 12, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KM)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4283188), filed by Tecossl, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Non-Disclosure Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - 929 Patent Application, #3 Exhibit C - Branded Product, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Avid Labs, Inc., #6 Summons Techmatic, Inc., #7 Summons Patrick Bates)(KM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tecossl, Inc v. Avid Labs, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techmatic Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avid Labs, LLC
Represented By: Trevor T. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tecossl, Inc
Represented By: James M. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?