GEICO Marine Insurance Company v. Monette

Plaintiff: GEICO Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: Charles Monette
Case Number: 5:2019cv00044
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Charles Monette of service of corrected Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Subpoena)(Allen, William)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Charles Monette of service of Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Allen, William)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED as follows: 1. Within 21 days, the parties shall meet to develop a proposed discovery plan; 2. Within 10 days of meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/28/2019.(KM)cc: COR
March 28, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, (STC)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against GEICO Marine Insurance Company by Charles Monette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Marine Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit B - 10/5/2018 Endorsement to Policy, #3 Exhibit C - 9/20/2018 Email to Monette)(Allen, William)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1. James K. Mondl's Motion for Admission pro hac vice #3 is GRANTED; and 2. James K. Mondl is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff GEICO Marine Insurance Company in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/14/2019. (STC)cc: COR w/ ECF Registration Form to J. Mondl
February 12, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #3 MOTION for James K. Mondl to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GEICO Marine Insurance Company (STC)
February 12, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to James K. Mondl re #3 MOTION for James K. Mondl to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GEICO Marine Insurance Company. (STC)
February 12, 2019 Conflict Check run. (STC)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for James K. Mondl to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GEICO Marine Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt)(STC)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GEICO Marine Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent Boat America Corporation, Corporate Parent GEICO Corp., Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company for GEICO Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(STC)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 5027078), filed by GEICO Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(STC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GEICO Marine Insurance Company v. Monette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Monette
Represented By: William W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: James K. Mondl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?