Davis v. Baker et al

Plaintiff: Charles Coleman Davis, Jr.
Defendant: Phillip Johnson and Joseph Baker
Case Number: 5:2019cv00107
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #8 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Joseph Baker, Phillip Johnson Joint Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Judgment on the PleadingsJOINT MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Joseph Baker, Phillip Johnson Joint Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings (JJ)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Joseph Baker, Phillip Johnson Joint Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Judgment on the PleadingsJOINT MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Joseph Baker, Phillip Johnson Joint Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Joseph Baker, Phillip Johnson. (Wright, Roger)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Joseph Baker, Phillip Johnson Joint Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Judgment on the PleadingsJOINT MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Joseph Baker, Phillip Johnson Joint Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Charles Coleman Davis, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Case - United States v. Cooper, 431 Fed.Appx. 399 (6th Cir. 2011))(Caldwell, Noel)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING by Charles Coleman Davis, Jr of Summons Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed Baker, #2 Summons Returned Executed Johnson)(Caldwell, Noel)
April 24, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #1 Complaint, #10 Answer to Complaint, #9 Answer to Complaint (JJ)
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Phillip Johnson.(Wright, Roger)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Joseph Baker.(Wright, Roger)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Joseph Baker, Phillip Johnson Joint Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings, JOINT MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Joseph Baker, Phillip Johnson Joint Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 State Court Record Order Granting Motion to Suppress, Fayette Circuit Court, Action No. 18-CR-00659)(Wright, Roger)
April 19, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Noel Caldwell re #6 Summons Returned Executed, #7 Summons Returned Executed; an incomplete summons was attached as the Main Document. Within 7 calendar days, file the summons with the declaration of service completed and with the certified mail receipt attached which states the method of service, as an electronic attachment to a document entitled Notice of Filing. cc: COR (JJ)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Coleman Davis, Jr via Certified Mail to (Attachments: #1 Receipt Certified Mail Receipt)(Caldwell, Noel)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Coleman Davis, Jr via Certified Mail to (Attachments: #1 Receipt Certified Mail Receipt)(Caldwell, Noel)
April 15, 2019 NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD re #5 Summons Returned Executed, #4 Summons Returned Executed are INCOMPLETE PDF documents filed as main documents; Attorney shall re-file the Civil Summons with the certified mail receipt within seven (7) calendar days. *MS* cc: COR (JJ)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 4/15/2019. (Caldwell, Noel) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (JJ).
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 4/15/2019. (Caldwell, Noel) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (JJ).
March 22, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Joseph Baker, Phillip Johnson; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JLM)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4311718), filed by Charles Coleman Davis, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit A-Order Dismissing and Granting Motion to Suppress)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Johnson
Represented By: Roger G. Wright
Represented By: J. Todd Henning
Represented By: Michael Keith Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Baker
Represented By: Roger G. Wright
Represented By: J. Todd Henning
Represented By: Michael Keith Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Coleman Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Noel Embry Caldwell
Represented By: Thomas L. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?