Lewis v. Monsanto Company

Plaintiff: William E. Lewis
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00160
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Clerk's Note: Case transferred has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-0236 re #5 Case Transferred to MDL. (STC)
April 29, 2019 Clerk's Note: JPMDL information extracted re #5 Case Transferred to MDL and electronically transmitted to AO. (SKV)
April 29, 2019 Clerk's Note re #5 Case Transferred to MDL: Case extracted and electronicallytransmitted to the USDC/CAND via CM/ECF. (CBD)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFIED ORDER received from Northern District of California re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. 130 filed in MDL Case Number 2741. (KJR)cc: COR
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2741 (KJR) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/29/2019) (SKV).
April 18, 2019 Clerk's Note: e-mail notification sent to MDL panel for review. (JJ)
April 18, 2019 Conflict Check run. (STC)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (KJR)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4328240), filed by William E. Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(KJR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Lewis
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Represented By: Ashton Rose Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?