Haggar v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Vanessa D. Hagger
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00161
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST re TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held 6/25/2019 (filed as DE 313 in 5:18-md-2809) by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation for proceedings held on 06/25/2019 before Judge Hon. Karen K. Caldwell.. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Browning, Carol) Modified text on 7/5/2019 (CBD).
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 6/25/2019 before Judge Karen K. Caldwell: The parties advised the Court of issues relating to discovery and the need to amend the discovery plan. The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. The parties shall submit a proposed revised schedule to the Court's Chambers by e-mail. If the parties are unable to agree, they may request another telephone conference. 2. The Court REFERS this matter to United States Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett to assist in discovery related issues. (Court Reporter Linda Mullen.) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al. (CBD)cc: COR
June 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Timothy Clark re Response to Order to Show Cause (291 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC). Error: Attorney filed the document in the master case only. Pursuant to the Court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18-md-2809) attorney should have filed the document in the master case and spread text to each related individual member case; Entry by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has re-filed the document in the master and member case files. No further action required by counsel as to this error. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
June 18, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Status Report (290 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
June 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Jenneifer Moore re Status Report (290 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC - ALL Cases). Error: attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit A," "Exhibit B." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 208 by Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al. Filed per QC re DE 291 in 5:18-md-2809.(CBD)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by David Taylor, Leatha Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for Production, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Initial Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Responses to Request for Production)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Moore, Jennifer) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (CBD).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RESCHEDULING JUNE 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE: the quarterly TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE currently scheduled for 6/18/2019 is RESCHEDULED to take place on 6/25/2019 at 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/12/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Lex D
May 17, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: (283 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) RESPONSE to Court's Order #246. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(TDA)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to (246 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) filed by David Taylor, Leatha Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Plaintiffs' Amended Proposed Case Management Order Establishing Standards and Procedures for Counsel Seeking Reimbursement for Common Benefit Fees and Costs, #2 Exhibit 2- Common Benefit Participation Agreement)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Moore, Jennifer)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al. REFILED pursuant to QC re DE #281 in Master Case(TDA)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 4/25/2019 before Judge Karen K. Caldwell: 1. Defendant's Amended Motion 247 for Order to Show Cause for Failure to Submit Plaintiff Profile Form is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. 2. The Court DIRECTS the parties to request court intervention as soon as possible if the fact discovery deadline of July 9, 2019 cannot be met. 3. The Quarterly Status Telephone Conference remains SCHEDULED for Tuesday, June 18, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel shall access the call by dialing 1-888-684-8852, then entering access code 6823688.(Tape #KYED-LEX__18-MD-2809-KKC_20190425_154840.) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al. (CBD)cc: COR
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that, within 21 days of the entry date of this order, plaintiffs MUST FILE re Motion 180 either: 1) an amended proposed order and amended Participation Agreement that addresses the issues raised in the questions in Section II of this order; 2) a written response to the questions raised in Section II (see Order for section I and II) of this order; or 3) both. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/25/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Motion (DE 224 in 5:18-md-2809, et al) is GRANTED and the Court's Order to Show Cause is continued sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/17/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 JOINT STATUS REPORT by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Myers Company, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Browning, Carol)
April 8, 2019 REMARK: Counsel is on notice that they shall refer to #www.kyed.uscourts.gov/518-md-02809-kkc for review of Orders, including but not limited to the Order Regarding Practice and Procedure Upon Transfer and Case Management Orders governing all cases in these MDL proceedings. If you are not registered as an ECF Filing User, please complete the ECF Registration Form and return it to the Clerk within twenty-one (21) days. cc: Order Regarding Practice & Procedure upon Transfer filed February 9, 2018 served via U.S. Mail to counsel not registered as ECF Filing Users. (CBD)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: 1. The Clerk is DIRECTED to ASSIGN all related matters to the Honorable Karen K. Caldwell on the Lexington docket. 2. All individual actions shall be consolidated with the MDL Master File No. 5:18-md-2809. 3. Actions shall be consolidated for purposes of discovery and other pre-trial matters. 4. A copy of this Order shall be filed in each appropriate case with a copy to all counsel (JLM)cc: COR
April 8, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4328373), filed by Vanessa D. Hagger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haggar v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa D. Hagger
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Represented By: Ashton Rose Smith
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?