Home Builders Association of Lexington, Inc. v. Lexington-Fayette Urban County Planning Commission et al
Plaintiff: Home Builders Association of Lexington, Inc.
Defendant: Karen Mundy, Frank Penn, Graham Pohl, Carolyn Plumlee, William Wilson, Larry Forester, Lexington-Fayette Urban County Planning Commission, Bruce Nicol, Jr., Headley Bell, Patrick Brewer, William Berkley and L. Michael Owens
Case Number: 5:2019cv00178
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge VanTatenhove for review: re #3 MOTION to Dismiss by Headley Bell, William Berkley, Patrick Brewer, Larry Forester, Lexington-Fayette Urban County Planning Commission, Karen Mundy, Bruce Nicol, Jr, L. Michael Owens, Frank Penn, Carolyn Plumlee, Graham Pohl, William Wilson (KJR)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss by Headley Bell, William Berkley, Patrick Brewer, Larry Forester, Lexington-Fayette Urban County Planning Commission, Karen Mundy, Bruce Nicol, Jr, L. Michael Owens, Frank Penn, Carolyn Plumlee, Graham Pohl, William Wilson filed by Headley Bell, William Berkley, Patrick Brewer, Larry Forester, Lexington-Fayette Urban County Planning Commission, Karen Mundy, Bruce Nicol, Jr, L. Michael Owens, Frank Penn, Carolyn Plumlee, Graham Pohl, William Wilson. (Moorman, Keith)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss by Headley Bell, William Berkley, Patrick Brewer, Larry Forester, Lexington-Fayette Urban County Planning Commission, Karen Mundy, Bruce Nicol, Jr, L. Michael Owens, Frank Penn, Carolyn Plumlee, Graham Pohl, William Wilson filed by Home Builders Association of Lexington, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affidavit of Todd Johnson)(Lear, William)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING by Headley Bell, William Berkley, Patrick Brewer, Larry Forester, Lexington-Fayette Urban County Planning Commission, Karen Mundy, Bruce Nicol, Jr, L. Michael Owens, Frank Penn, Carolyn Plumlee, Graham Pohl, William Wilson re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Replacement state court record)(Moorman, Keith)
April 23, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Headley Bell, William Berkley, Patrick Brewer, Larry Forester, Lexington-Fayette Urban County Planning Commission, Karen Mundy, Bruce Nicol, Jr, L. Michael Owens, Frank Penn, Carolyn Plumlee, Graham Pohl, William Wilson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(JJ)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Co. Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-1205. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4341927), filed by Lexington-Fayette Urban County Planning Commission, L. Michael Owens, William Berkley, Bruce Nicol, Jr, Karen Mundy, Carolyn Plumlee, Headley Bell, William Wilson, Larry Forester, Graham Pohl, Patrick Brewer, Frank Penn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record Section 1-10, #3 State Court Record Section 11-22, #4 State Court Record Scetion 23-35)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home Builders Association of Lexington, Inc. v. Lexington-Fayette Urban County Planning Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Builders Association of Lexington, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Clay Reeves
Represented By: Nick Nicholson
Represented By: T. Bruce Simpson, Jr.
Represented By: William M. Lear, Jr.
Represented By: George E. Nicholson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Mundy
Represented By: Jason M. Halligan
Represented By: Keith Moorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Penn
Represented By: Jason M. Halligan
Represented By: Keith Moorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Pohl
Represented By: Jason M. Halligan
Represented By: Keith Moorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Plumlee
Represented By: Jason M. Halligan
Represented By: Keith Moorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Wilson
Represented By: Jason M. Halligan
Represented By: Keith Moorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Forester
Represented By: Jason M. Halligan
Represented By: Keith Moorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington-Fayette Urban County Planning Commission
Represented By: Jason M. Halligan
Represented By: Keith Moorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Nicol, Jr.
Represented By: Jason M. Halligan
Represented By: Keith Moorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Headley Bell
Represented By: Jason M. Halligan
Represented By: Keith Moorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Brewer
Represented By: Jason M. Halligan
Represented By: Keith Moorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Berkley
Represented By: Jason M. Halligan
Represented By: Keith Moorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Michael Owens
Represented By: Jason M. Halligan
Represented By: Keith Moorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?