Modern Holdings, LLC, et al v Corning Incorporated, et al
Plaintiff: David Caldwell, Clyde Simpson, Steven Coffman, Marthetta Clark, Nathaniel Johnson, Charlie Perry, Janet Mitchel, Cesirely Coffman, Sadie Gambrel, Stacy Wilson, Chantee Nolan, Demmontrell Trumbo, Erica Ford, Hugh Shepherd, Sellers and Sellers Company, Kelvin Galbreath, Modern Holdings, LLC, Wanda Beasley, Michelle Coffman Morton, Darlene Hagan, Diana Perry Coffey, David Johnson, Christian Robert Cheak, Margo Caldwell, Estate of Richard Manning, Vivian Troxler, Christopher Johnson, Connie Mullins, Charles Ford, Tyrone Johnson, Ann Hawkins, Jozette Hayes, Glen Ball, Rodney Johnson, Barbara Trumbo, Deborah Stevenson, Daniel Bartleson, Justine Ramirez, Joseph Johnson, Gloria Lewis, Ethel Hunn, Brenda Carter, Bonita Ramzy, Bethel Wade, James Ross, Holly Gooch, Anita Ross, Katherine Doty, Estate of Frank Walker, Charles Lawson, Anthony Manning, Melvin Harris, Barbara Manning, Lonnie Johnson, Gary Ford, Robert Bradley Miller, Nancy Vanover, Darlene Lister, James Hunn, Walter Smith, Justin Leon Burgess, Gene Walker, Estate of Betty Johnson, James Dollins, David Chenault, Jr., George Chenault, Willie Harris, Jennifer Fox, Alice Miller, Bob Miller, Latrese Barbour, Gloria Frye, Clifford Lister, David Chenault, III, Dejuanna Trumbo, John Raines, Jr., Misti Llamas, William Trumbo, Rita Bowman, Marilyn Burgess, Chenice Gaans, Elana Ford, Jonathan Llamas, Rosetta Ford, Demaya Trumbo, Fanny Walker, Victoria Troxler, Margret Peebles, Darren Hayes, Sonya Coffman, Estate of Mike Orberson, Sharon Price, Donna Smith, Chester Kavanaugh, Bobbie Lemons, David Owsley, Brihana Trumbo, Harvey Chenault, Cara Rogers, Danetta Owsley, Otis Ford, William Galbreath, Steve Reed, Dewayne Trumbo and Robert Lance
Defendant: City of Danville Kentucky, Philips Electronics North America Corporation, John Does and Corning Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2019cv00182
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #24 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Glen Ball, Latrese Barbour, Daniel Bartleson, Wanda Beasley, Rita Bowman, Justin Leon Burgess, Marilyn Burgess, David Caldwell, Margo Caldwell, Brenda Carter, Christian Robert Cheak, David Chenault, Jr, George Chenault, Harvey Ch - no response filed. (JLM)
June 26, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Glen Ball, Latrese Barbour, Daniel Bartleson, Wanda Beasley, Rita Bowman, Justin Leon Burgess, Marilyn Burgess, David Caldwell, Margo Caldwell, Brenda Carter, Christian Robert Cheak, David Chenault, Jr, George Chena, #24 MOTION for Leave by Glen Ball, Latrese Barbour, Daniel Bartleson, Wanda Beasley, Rita Bowman, Justin Leon Burgess, Marilyn Burgess, David Caldwell, Margo Caldwell, Brenda Carter, Christian Robert Cheak, David Chenault, Jr, George Chenault, Harvey Ch filed by Corning Incorporated. (Kelly, Donald)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: granting #25 Proposed Agreed Order, and Defendants shall have up to and including Wednesday, June 26, 2019, by which to file a response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/18/19. (JLM)cc: COR
June 14, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #25 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Corning Incorporated (JLM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 25 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Corning Incorporated. (Kelly, Donald)
June 5, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave by Glen Ball, Latrese Barbour, Daniel Bartleson, Wanda Beasley, Rita Bowman, Justin Leon Burgess, Marilyn Burgess, David Caldwell, Margo Caldwell, Brenda Carter, Christian Robert Cheak, David Chenault, Jr, George Chenault, Harvey Chenault, David Chenault, III, Marthetta Clark, Diana Perry Coffey, Cesirely Coffman, Sonya Coffman, Steven Coffman, James Dollins, Katherine Doty, Estate of Betty Johnson, Estate of Frank Walker, Estate of Mike Orberson, Estate of Richard Manning, Charles Ford, Elana Ford, Erica Ford, Gary Ford, Otis Ford, Rosetta Ford, Jennifer Fox, Gloria Frye, Chenice Gaans, Kelvin Galbreath, William Galbreath, Sadie Gambrel, Holly Gooch, Darlene Hagan, Melvin Harris, Willie Harris, Ann Hawkins, Darren Hayes, Jozette Hayes, Ethel Hunn, James Hunn, Christopher Johnson, David Johnson, Joseph Johnson, Lonnie Johnson, Nathaniel Johnson, Rodney Johnson, Tyrone Johnson, Chester Kavanaugh, Robert Lance, Charles Lawson, Bobbie Lemons, Gloria Lewis, Clifford Lister, Darlene Lister, Jonathan Llamas, Misti Llamas, Anthony Manning, Barbara Manning, Alice Miller, Bob Miller, Robert Bradley Miller, Janet Mitchel, Modern Holdings, LLC, Michelle Coffman Morton, Connie Mullins, Chantee Nolan(as Guardian and), Chantee Nolan, Danetta Owsley, David Owsley, Margret Peebles, Charlie Perry, Sharon Price, John Raines, Jr, Justine Ramirez, Bonita Ramzy, Steve Reed, Cara Rogers, Anita Ross, James Ross, Sellers and Sellers Company, Hugh Shepherd, Clyde Simpson, Donna Smith, Walter Smith, Deborah Stevenson, Victoria Troxler, Vivian Troxler, Barbara Trumbo, Brihana Trumbo, Dejuanna Trumbo, Demaya Trumbo, Demmontrell Trumbo, Dewayne Trumbo, William Trumbo, Nancy Vanover, Bethel Wade, Fanny Walker, Gene Walker, Stacy Wilson to file First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A First Amended Complaint, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Order)(Getty, Richard)
June 5, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Corning Incorporated and Philips Electronics North America Corporation, #16 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Corning Incorporated, Philips Electronics North America Corporation , #13 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by City of Danville Kentucky MOTION to Dismiss by City of Danville Kentucky (JLM)
June 4, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Corning Incorporated, Philips Electronics North America Corporation filed by Corning Incorporated, Philips Electronics North America Corporation. (Johnson, Brian)
June 4, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Corning Incorporated and Philips Electronics North America Corporation filed by Corning Incorporated, Philips Electronics North America Corporation. (Johnson, Brian)
June 4, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to #13 , #19 filed by City of Danville Kentucky. (Mando, Jeffrey)
May 23, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Glen Ball, Latrese Barbour, Daniel Bartleson, Wanda Beasley, Rita Bowman, Justin Leon Burgess, Marilyn Burgess, David Caldwell, Margo Caldwell, Brenda Carter, Christian Robert Cheak, David Chenault, Jr, George Chenault, Harvey Chenault, David Chenault, III, Marthetta Clark, Diana Perry Coffey, Cesirely Coffman, Sonya Coffman, Steven Coffman, James Dollins, Katherine Doty, Estate of Betty Johnson, Estate of Frank Walker, Estate of Mike Orberson, Estate of Richard Manning, Charles Ford, Elana Ford, Erica Ford, Gary Ford, Otis Ford, Rosetta Ford, Jennifer Fox, Gloria Frye, Chenice Gaans, Kelvin Galbreath, William Galbreath, Sadie Gambrel, Holly Gooch, Darlene Hagan, Melvin Harris, Willie Harris, Ann Hawkins, Darren Hayes, Jozette Hayes, Ethel Hunn, James Hunn, Christopher Johnson, David Johnson, Joseph Johnson, Lonnie Johnson, Nathaniel Johnson, Rodney Johnson, Tyrone Johnson, Chester Kavanaugh, Robert Lance, Charles Lawson, Bobbie Lemons, Gloria Lewis, Clifford Lister, Darlene Lister, Jonathan Llamas, Misti Llamas, Anthony Manning, Barbara Manning, Alice Miller, Bob Miller, Robert Bradley Miller, Janet Mitchel, Modern Holdings, LLC, Michelle Coffman Morton, Connie Mullins, Chantee Nolan(as Guardian and), Chantee Nolan, Danetta Owsley, David Owsley, Margret Peebles, Charlie Perry, Sharon Price, John Raines, Jr, Justine Ramirez, Bonita Ramzy, Steve Reed, Cara Rogers, Anita Ross, James Ross, Sellers and Sellers Company, Hugh Shepherd, Clyde Simpson, Donna Smith, Walter Smith, Deborah Stevenson, Victoria Troxler, Vivian Troxler, Barbara Trumbo, Brihana Trumbo, Dejuanna Trumbo, Demaya Trumbo, Demmontrell Trumbo, Dewayne Trumbo, William Trumbo, Nancy Vanover, Bethel Wade, Fanny Walker, Gene Walker, Stacy Wilson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A Getty letter City, #3 Exhibit B Lassiter email Philips, #4 Exhibit C City letter Philips, #5 Exhibit D Scott letter State, #6 Exhibit E Philips email bios, #7 Exhibit F City Ordinance, #8 Exhibit G Corning recommendation, #9 Exhibit H Wilson Affidavit, #10 Exhibit I Memorandum Opinion and Order, #11 Proposed Order)(Getty, Richard)
May 21, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #13 City of Danville Motion to Dismiss filed by Glen Ball, Latrese Barbour, Daniel Bartleson, Wanda Beasley, Rita Bowman, Justin Leon Burgess, Marilyn Burgess, David Caldwell, Margo Caldwell, Brenda Carter, Christian Robert Cheak, David Chenault, Jr, George Chenault, Harvey Chenault, David Chenault, III, Marthetta Clark, Diana Perry Coffey, Cesirely Coffman, Sonya Coffman, Steven Coffman, James Dollins, Katherine Doty, Estate of Betty Johnson, Estate of Frank Walker, Estate of Mike Orberson, Estate of Richard Manning, Charles Ford, Elana Ford, Erica Ford, Gary Ford, Otis Ford, Rosetta Ford, Jennifer Fox, Gloria Frye, Chenice Gaans, Kelvin Galbreath, William Galbreath, Sadie Gambrel, Holly Gooch, Darlene Hagan, Melvin Harris, Willie Harris, Ann Hawkins, Darren Hayes, Jozette Hayes, Ethel Hunn, James Hunn, Christopher Johnson, David Johnson, Joseph Johnson, Lonnie Johnson, Nathaniel Johnson, Rodney Johnson, Tyrone Johnson, Chester Kavanaugh, Robert Lance, Charles Lawson, Bobbie Lemons, Gloria Lewis, Clifford Lister, Darlene Lister, Jonathan Llamas, Misti Llamas, Anthony Manning, Barbara Manning, Alice Miller, Bob Miller, Robert Bradley Miller, Janet Mitchel, Michelle Coffman Morton, Connie Mullins, Chantee Nolan(as Guardian and), Chantee Nolan, Danetta Owsley, David Owsley, Margret Peebles, Charlie Perry, Sharon Price, John Raines, Jr, Justine Ramirez, Bonita Ramzy, Steve Reed, Cara Rogers, Anita Ross, James Ross, Sellers and Sellers Company, Hugh Shepherd, Clyde Simpson, Donna Smith, Walter Smith, Deborah Stevenson, Victoria Troxler, Vivian Troxler, Barbara Trumbo, Brihana Trumbo, Dejuanna Trumbo, Demaya Trumbo, Demmontrell Trumbo, Dewayne Trumbo, William Trumbo, Nancy Vanover, Bethel Wade, Fanny Walker, Gene Walker, Stacy Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Getty letter City of Danville, #2 Exhibit B Lassiter email Philips, #3 Exhibit C City of Danville letter Philips Netherlands, #4 Exhibit D Ron Scott letter EEC, #5 Exhibit E Philips email regarding officials' bios, #6 Exhibit F City of Danville ordinance, #7 Exhibit G Corning recommendation to brief officials, #8 Exhibit H Stacy Wilson Affidavit, #9 Exhibit I Memorandum Opinion and Order in 13-405 DE 110)(Getty, Richard)
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #16 Motion for Partial Dismissal filed by Glen Ball, Latrese Barbour, Daniel Bartleson, Wanda Beasley, Rita Bowman, Justin Leon Burgess, Marilyn Burgess, David Caldwell, Margo Caldwell, Brenda Carter, Christian Robert Cheak, David Chenault, Jr, George Chenault, Harvey Chenault, David Chenault, III, Marthetta Clark, Diana Perry Coffey, Cesirely Coffman, Sonya Coffman, Steven Coffman, James Dollins, Katherine Doty, Estate of Betty Johnson, Estate of Frank Walker, Estate of Mike Orberson, Estate of Richard Manning, Charles Ford, Elana Ford, Erica Ford, Gary Ford, Otis Ford, Rosetta Ford, Jennifer Fox, Gloria Frye, Chenice Gaans, Kelvin Galbreath, William Galbreath, Sadie Gambrel, Holly Gooch, Darlene Hagan, Melvin Harris, Willie Harris, Ann Hawkins, Darren Hayes, Jozette Hayes, Ethel Hunn, James Hunn, Christopher Johnson, David Johnson, Joseph Johnson, Lonnie Johnson, Nathaniel Johnson, Rodney Johnson, Tyrone Johnson, Chester Kavanaugh, Robert Lance, Charles Lawson, Bobbie Lemons, Gloria Lewis, Clifford Lister, Darlene Lister, Jonathan Llamas, Misti Llamas, Anthony Manning, Barbara Manning, Alice Miller, Bob Miller, Robert Bradley Miller, Janet Mitchel, Modern Holdings, LLC, Michelle Coffman Morton, Connie Mullins, Chantee Nolan(as Guardian and), Chantee Nolan, Danetta Owsley, David Owsley, Margret Peebles, Charlie Perry, Sharon Price, John Raines, Jr, Justine Ramirez, Bonita Ramzy, Steve Reed, Cara Rogers, Anita Ross, James Ross, Sellers and Sellers Company, Hugh Shepherd, Clyde Simpson, Donna Smith, Walter Smith, Deborah Stevenson, Victoria Troxler, Vivian Troxler, Barbara Trumbo, Brihana Trumbo, Dejuanna Trumbo, Demaya Trumbo, Demmontrell Trumbo, Dewayne Trumbo, William Trumbo, Nancy Vanover, Bethel Wade, Fanny Walker, Gene Walker, Stacy Wilson. (Getty, Richard)
May 21, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Glen Ball, Latrese Barbour, Daniel Bartleson, Wanda Beasley, Rita Bowman, Justin Leon Burgess, Marilyn Burgess, David Caldwell, Margo Caldwell, Brenda Carter, Christian Robert Cheak, David Chenault, Jr, George Chenault, Harvey Chenault, David Chenault, III, Marthetta Clark, Diana Perry Coffey, Cesirely Coffman, Sonya Coffman, Steven Coffman, James Dollins, Katherine Doty, Estate of Betty Johnson, Estate of Frank Walker, Estate of Mike Orberson, Estate of Richard Manning, Charles Ford, Elana Ford, Erica Ford, Gary Ford, Otis Ford, Rosetta Ford, Jennifer Fox, Gloria Frye, Chenice Gaans, Kelvin Galbreath, William Galbreath, Sadie Gambrel, Holly Gooch, Darlene Hagan, Melvin Harris, Willie Harris, Ann Hawkins, Darren Hayes, Jozette Hayes, Ethel Hunn, James Hunn, Christopher Johnson, David Johnson, Joseph Johnson, Lonnie Johnson, Nathaniel Johnson, Rodney Johnson, Tyrone Johnson, Chester Kavanaugh, Robert Lance, Charles Lawson, Bobbie Lemons, Gloria Lewis, Clifford Lister, Darlene Lister, Jonathan Llamas, Misti Llamas, Anthony Manning, Barbara Manning, Alice Miller, Bob Miller, Robert Bradley Miller, Janet Mitchel, Modern Holdings, LLC, Michelle Coffman Morton, Connie Mullins, Chantee Nolan(as Guardian and), Chantee Nolan, Danetta Owsley, David Owsley, Margret Peebles, Charlie Perry, Sharon Price, John Raines, Jr, Justine Ramirez, Bonita Ramzy, Steve Reed, Cara Rogers, Anita Ross, James Ross, Sellers and Sellers Company, Hugh Shepherd, Clyde Simpson, Donna Smith, Walter Smith, Deborah Stevenson, Victoria Troxler, Vivian Troxler, Barbara Trumbo, Brihana Trumbo, Dejuanna Trumbo, Demaya Trumbo, Demmontrell Trumbo, Dewayne Trumbo, William Trumbo, Nancy Vanover, Bethel Wade, Fanny Walker, Gene Walker, Stacy Wilson. (Getty, Richard)
April 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Partial Dismissal for failure to state a claim by Corning Incorporated, Philips Electronics North America Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brian) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (JLM).
April 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Corning Incorporated and Philips Electronics North America Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Jordan)
April 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan M. White on behalf of Corning Incorporated (White, Jordan)
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by City of Danville Kentucky , MOTION to Dismiss by City of Danville Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mando, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph F. Madonia ; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark L. Durbin. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 4/30/19. (JLM)cc: COR
April 30, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #10 MOTION for Joseph F. Madonia to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Corning Incorporated ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4347175), #11 MOTION for Mark L. Durbin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Corning Incorporated ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4347202) (JLM)
April 30, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Mark L. Durbin, Joseph F. Madonia. (JLM)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Mark L. Durbin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Corning Incorporated ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4347202) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Mark L. Durbin and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Donald)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Joseph F. Madonia to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Corning Incorporated ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4347175) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Madonia and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Donald)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Based on the undersigned's review of this action, which reflects that this action is related to Modern Holdings, LLC, et al., v. Corning, Inc., et al, 5:13-cv-405-GFVT, and pursuant to LR 40 and this Court's General Order No. 18-14, IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Gregory F. VanTatenhove, United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/29/19.(JLM)cc: COR
April 29, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Daniel E. Linneman for City of Danville Kentucky, added. (JLM)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Mando on behalf of City of Danville Kentucky (Mando, Jeffrey)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Philips Electronics North America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Signify N.V., Other Affiliate Signify North America Corporation for Philips Electronics North America Corporation.. (Johnson, Brian)
April 25, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joseph M. Hood recused. Case reassigned to Judge Karen K. Caldwell for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/25/19.(JLM)cc: COR
April 24, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Corning Incorporated. (JLM)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boyle Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-125. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4342928), filed by Corning Incorporated, Philips Electronics North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Newspaper Article, #2 State Court Record B, #3 Exhibit C-Co-Defendant's Consent, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modern Holdings, LLC, et al v Corning Incorporated, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Caldwell
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Simpson
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Coffman
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marthetta Clark
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Johnson
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Perry
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Mitchel
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesirely Coffman
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadie Gambrel
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Wilson
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantee Nolan
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demmontrell Trumbo
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Ford
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh Shepherd
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sellers and Sellers Company
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Galbreath
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modern Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Beasley
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Coffman Morton
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Hagan
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Perry Coffey
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Johnson
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Robert Cheak
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margo Caldwell
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Richard Manning
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Troxler
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Johnson
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Mullins
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ford
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Johnson
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Hawkins
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jozette Hayes
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Ball
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Johnson
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Trumbo
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Stevenson
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bartleson
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Ramirez
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Johnson
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Lewis
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Hunn
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Carter
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonita Ramzy
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethel Wade
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ross
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Gooch
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Ross
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Doty
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Frank Walker
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lawson
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Manning
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Harris
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Manning
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Johnson
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Ford
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bradley Miller
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Vanover
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Lister
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hunn
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Smith
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Leon Burgess
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Walker
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Betty Johnson
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dollins
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Chenault, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Chenault
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Harris
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Fox
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Miller
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Miller
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latrese Barbour
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Frye
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Lister
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Chenault, III
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dejuanna Trumbo
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Raines, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misti Llamas
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Trumbo
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Bowman
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Burgess
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chenice Gaans
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elana Ford
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Llamas
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosetta Ford
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demaya Trumbo
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fanny Walker
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Troxler
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margret Peebles
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Hayes
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Coffman
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Mike Orberson
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Price
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Smith
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester Kavanaugh
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Lemons
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Owsley
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brihana Trumbo
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Chenault
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cara Rogers
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danetta Owsley
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Ford
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Galbreath
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Reed
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Trumbo
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lance
Represented By: Jessica Katherine Winters
Represented By: Matthew English
Represented By: Evan McDonald Rice
Represented By: Mary Ann Getty
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Danville Kentucky
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Represented By: Daniel E. Linneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Electronics North America Corporation
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Represented By: Emma R. Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corning Incorporated
Represented By: Mark L. Durbin
Represented By: Donald J. Kelly
Represented By: Joseph F. Madonia
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?