Phillips v. Price et al
Plaintiff: Billy Ron Phillips
Defendant: Jonathan R. Grate, Emily Price, Brad Adams, Ronnie Hanes, Mendalyn Cochran and Jon Doe
Case Number: 5:2019cv00185
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #8 Filing Fee Received (STC)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Filing fee received - $ 400, receipt number 5027842 (Received 6/24/2019) (STC)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT: 1. Plaintiff's Complaint #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 3. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/25/2019.(STC)cc: Plt
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1. 1. Phillips' Complaint #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with an Order of the Court 2. The Court will enter an appropriate Judgment. 3. This matter is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/25/2019.(STC)cc: Plt
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1. Clerk mark assigned case number on EDKY Form 519 and forward to Phillips; 2. w/in 30 days, Phillips MUST either pay $400 filing and administrative fees OR complete and file EDKY 519 Form; 3. #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/20/2019. (STC)cc: Plt
April 25, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #1 Complaint - No filing fee received, ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Billy Ron Phillips, pro se (JJ)
April 25, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JJ)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Billy Ron Phillips, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (JJ)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Billy Ron Phillips, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Summons, #3 Mailing Envelope - Post marked 4/22/2019)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Price et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan R. Grate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Hanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendalyn Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Ron Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?