Pendermon v. Moore et al

Plaintiff: Andre S. Pendermon
Defendant: Montgomery County Jail, Brittany Moore and Officer Power
Case Number: 5:2019cv00196
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. 2. Financial documentation indicates he lacks sufficient income to pay initial partial filing fee and payment of such fee is DEFERRED. 3. Clerk shall open account in Pendermon's name for receipt of filing fee. Clerk complete FORM EDKY 525 and serve copy of this Order and Notice of Payment form upon Jailer/Warden and Office of General Counsel for Dept. Corrections in Frankfort, KY. 4. Each month Pendermon's custodial shall send Clerk payment as described until entire $350 filing fee is paid. 5. #8 Motion to Continue/more facts is DENIED. 6. Pendermon must immediately advise Clerk's office of change of mailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of case. 7. Matter stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/24/2019. (GLD)cc: Pro Se Plaintiff, Jailer w/EDKY 525; Office of General Counsel, Dept. Corrections w/EDKY 525,Finance Modified on 5/24/2019 (GLD). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2019: #1 EDKY 525 form) (GLD).
May 23, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre S. Pendermon, #7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, #8 MOTION to Continue by Andre S. Pendermon (JLM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue/More Facts by Andre S. Pendermon, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (JLM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Andre S. Pendermon. (JLM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre S. Pendermon, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 envelope postmarked 5/21/19)(JLM)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1. denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; 2. The Clerk of the Court will mark the assigned case number on (a) an affidavit of assets/in forma pauperis application [Form AO-240]; and (b) a Certificate of Inmate Account [EDKY Form 523] and send them to Pendermon; 3. Should Pendermon wish to pursue this federal action, he must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or (1) have the Certificate of Inmate Account certified by prison staff, (2) complete the Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis Application, and (3) file both of these documents with this Court; and 4. Pendermon must take these steps within thirty (30) days, or his case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/6/19. (JLM)cc: COR,Plt w/forms via U.S. mail.
May 2, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO pso for review: #1 Complaint (Referred) (GLD)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample caption page)(GLD)
May 2, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre S. Pendermon (GLD)
May 2, 2019 Conflict Check run. (GLD)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre S. Pendermon, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (GLD)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Andre S. Pendermon, pro se. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope Postmarked 4/29/19)(GLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pendermon v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre S. Pendermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?