Mellow v. Adient US LLC
Plaintiff: Eric Mellow
Defendant: Adient US LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00212
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas R. Conlon. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/26/19. (JLM)cc: COR
June 26, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #17 MOTION for Nicholas R. Conlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Mellow ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4394864) (JLM)
June 25, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Nicholas R. Conlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Mellow ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4394864) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nicholas R. Conlon, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Trent)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's #15 Second Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas R. Conlon is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/24/2019. (KM)cc: COR
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Nicholas R. Conlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Mellow ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4392522) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nicholas R. Conlon, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Trent)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: denying without prejudice #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas R. Conlon. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/21/19. (JLM)cc: COR
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jason T. Brown. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/21/19. (JLM)cc: COR
June 21, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #4 Notice to Attorney - Lotus Cannon has not responded. (JLM)
June 21, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #11 MOTION for Jason T. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Mellow ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4391247), #12 MOTION for Nicholas R. Conlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Mellow ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4391261) (JLM)
June 21, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Jason T. Brown, Nicholas R. Conlon. (JLM)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Nicholas R. Conlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Mellow ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4391261) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit of Nicholas R. Conlon, #3 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Trent)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Jason T. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Mellow ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4391247) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit of Jason T. Brown, #3 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Trent)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert E. DeRose; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jessica R. Doogan. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/4/19. (JLM)cc: COR
June 4, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #8 MOTION for Robert E. DeRose to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Mellow ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4374821), #9 MOTION for Jessica R. Doogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Mellow ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4374822) (JLM)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Jessica R. Doogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Mellow ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4374822) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Trent)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Robert E. DeRose to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Mellow ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4374821) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Trent)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: DENYING Attorneys Robert E. DeRose & Jessica R. Doogan's #5 #6 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/31/19. (KJR)cc: COR
May 30, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #6 MOTION for Jessica R. Doogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Mellow ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4372436), #5 MOTION for Robert E. DeRose to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Mellow ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4372400) (JLM)
May 30, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Robert E. DeRose, II, Jessica R. Doogan. (JLM)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Jessica R. Doogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Mellow ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4372436) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Trent)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Robert E. DeRose to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Mellow ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4372400) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Trent)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Robert E. DeRose, Jessica R. Doogan, Jason T. Brown, Nicholas Conlon, Lotus Cannon by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Notice)(JLM)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Adient US LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JLM)
May 15, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4360207), filed by Eric Mellow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Company Handbook)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mellow v. Adient US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adient US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Mellow
Represented By: Lotus Cannon
Represented By: Trent Taylor
Represented By: Robert E. DeRose, II
Represented By: Nicholas R. Conlon
Represented By: Jason T. Brown
Represented By: Jessica R. Doogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?