Jacina v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kay Jacina
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. and Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00238
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Referring Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Murphy Oil USA, Inc. of Service (Jones, David)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Plaintiff's #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/15/2019.(JJ)cc: COR
July 12, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kay Jacina (JJ)
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Walmart, Inc. of Service of Wal-Mart's Initial Disclosures (Stivers, Catherine)
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kay Jacina filed by Kay Jacina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hoston v. Carolina Freight Carriers Corp. 936 F.2d 573 (6th Cir. 1991) (unpublished decision))(Friedman, Hal)
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURES (Plaintiff's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Kay Jacina.(Friedman, Hal)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURES Initial Rule 26 by Murphy Oil USA, Inc..(Jones, David)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. NLT 7/12/2019 parties exchange Rule 26(a)(1) information; 2. NLT 11/11/2019, plaintiff disclose identity of expert witnesses, NLT 12/11/2019 defendant disclose same; 3. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due within 30 days of the discovery of new information, but by NLT 30 days prior to close of discovery; 4. NLT 2/17/2020, parties complete all discovery; 5. Discovery disputes referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge (Stinnett) selected by random draw; 6. All motions for extensions of time referred to undersigned for disposition; 7. Parties may not be agreement extend any deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order or for responses to motions; 8. Plaintiff shall have until 8/30/2019 to file motion to amend pleadings or join additional parties, Defendants shall have until 9/30/2019 to do the same; 9. NLT 3/17/2020, parties shall file dispositive and Daubert Motions; 10. On or before 6/29/2020, counsel shall file, submit to Court's chambers & provide to opposing counsel witness lists, exhibits lists, and pretrial memorandum; 11. On or before 6/29/2019, counsel shall pre-mark & number all exhibits & provide copies to opposing counsel; 12. On or before 6/29/2019, counsel shall file with Clerk & submit to court, Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions; 13. On or before 7/6/2019, counsel shall file objections to the use of depositions or to the admissibility of exhibits; 14. The above listed pretrial filings may be submitted to the undersigned via email; 15. NLT 7/13/2020, parties submit to chambers a copy of each exhibit; 16. Assigned for JURY TRIAL set for 7/20/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves, counsel to appear at 8:30 a.m. (3 days). 17. Parties are directed to file a joint status report the 1st Monday of each month; 18. Parties are directed to use the services of a private mediator in the event they seek to mediate their dispute. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/9/2019.(KM)cc: COR,D,JC
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stivers, Catherine)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - March 26, 2019 Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - April 3, 2019 Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - April 10, 2019 Email Chain, #4 Exhibit 4 - Request for Admission to Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff's Response to Request for Admission, #6 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories & RFPD, #7 Proposed Order)(Stivers, Catherine)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Walmart, Inc. of Service of Walmart's Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admission (Stivers, Catherine)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kay Jacina (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Exchange Between Counsel April 10, 2019, #2 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Hal)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. NLT 30 days parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f). 2. At the meeting, parties shall exchange disclosures required by Rule 26(f). 3. NLT 10 after the meeting, parties shall file a written joint report. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(JJ)cc: COR
June 5, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: #1 Notice of Removal,, (SLH)
June 5, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SLH) Modified file date on 6/5/2019 (SLH).
June 4, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart, Inc..(SLH)
June 4, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Murphy Oil USA, Inc..(SLH)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Murphy Oil USA, Inc. (SLH)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE by Walmart, Inc. (SLH)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc.. (SLH)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Murphy Oil USA, Inc., Walmart, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent WMT for Walmart, Inc.; Corporate Parent Murphy USA, Inc. for Murphy Oil USA, Inc... (SLH)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jessamine Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00191. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4377559), filed by Murphy Oil USA, Inc., Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3-Request for Admission, #5 Exhibit 4-Plaintiff's Response to RFA, #6 Exhibit 5-Interrogatories and RFPD to Plaintiff, #7 Exhibit 6-Plantiff's Response to INT and RFPD, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Notice of Removal to State Court)(SLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacina v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kay Jacina
Represented By: Hal D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Amanda Stivers
Represented By: Christopher Rennie Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?