Holt v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al.
Plaintiff: Nickalus T. Holt
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Standard Guaranty Insurance Co. and American Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00250
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AGREED ORDER re #14 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Replies due by 8/30/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/14/2019.(STC)cc: COR
August 15, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #14 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (STC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(VanVactor, Zachary)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC filed by Nickalus T. Holt. (Ellison, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: (1) If Plaintiff wishes to respond to the pending #8 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim, Plaintiff may respond on or before 8/9/2019; and (2) The time for a reply to any response shall be governed by Local Rule 7.1(c). Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/28/2019.(JJ)cc: COR
June 27, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #11 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Regarding Motion to Dismiss D.E. #8 by Nickalus T. Holt (JJ)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Regarding Motion to Dismiss D.E. #8 by Nickalus T. Holt. (Ellison, Matthew) Modified text on 6/27/2019 (JJ).
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Security Insurance Company.(Haara, Brian)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Standard Guaranty Insurance Co..(Haara, Brian)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Holt I Compl. (filed Dec. 11, 2014), #2 Exhibit 2 - Holt I Mot. for Summ. J., Def. J. & Order of Sale (filed July 17, 2018), #3 Exhibit 3 - Holt I Countercl. (filed Dec. 9, 2015), #4 Exhibit 4 - Holt I Order (entered May 25, 2017), #5 Exhibit 5 - Holt I Mot. for Leave to File Am. Answer & Countercl. (filed July 27, 2017), #6 Exhibit 6 - Holt I Proposed 1st Am. Answer & Am. Countercl. (filed July 27, 2017), #7 Exhibit 7 - Holt I Order (entered May 30, 2018), #8 Exhibit 8 - Holt I Resp. (filed Aug. 6, 2018), #9 Exhibit 9 - Holt I Order (entered Feb. 1, 2019), #10 Exhibit 10 - Holt I Notice of Service (filed May 24, 2019), #11 Proposed Order)(VanVactor, Zachary)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Computershare US Services, Inc. for Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.. (VanVactor, Zachary)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Neal F. Bailen and Zachary M. VanVactor. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (MDC)
June 17, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Standard Guaranty Insurance Company ("SGIC") identifying Corporate Parent American Security Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc., Corporate Parent Interfinancial Inc., Other Affiliate AIZ for Standard Guaranty Insurance Company. (MDC)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Security Insurance Company ("ASIC") identifying Corporate Parent Interfinancial Inc., Corporate Parent Assurant Inc., Other Affiliate AIZ for American Security Insurance Company. (MDC)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Forrest Bailen, Zachary Myers VanVactor on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Filed in State Court Records. See #1 (MDC)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Woodford Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-87. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4387165), filed by Standard Guaranty Insurance Co., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, American Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Nickalus Holt Mortgage Statement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Zachary Myers VanVactor
Represented By: Neal Forrest Bailen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Guaranty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Brian Frank Haara
Represented By: Matthew W. Swafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian Frank Haara
Represented By: Matthew W. Swafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nickalus T. Holt
Represented By: Matthew David Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?