Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois v. Armstrong et al
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Defendant: Patrick B. Armstrong and Michelle N. Armstrong
Case Number: 5:2019cv00270
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 1) All discovery disputes REFERRED to magistrate judge (Atkins) for appropriate resolution; 2) Parties shall assess potential for agreed resolution of case; 3) initial disclosures due by 9/12/2019; 4) motions to amend pleadings/join parties due by 10/11/2019; 5) Discovery due by 12/20/2019; 6) Expert disclosures due by 11/15/2019; 7) Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2020; 8) motions in limine and Daubert motions due by 1/31/2019; 9) all motions for extension of time or to modify this scheduling order referred to undersigned for disposition; 10) scope of discovery governed by FRCP; 11) motion practice governed by LR 7.1 except as provided herein; 12) exhibit list, pre-marked exhibits, witness list, pretrial memo, agreed proposed jury instructions due at least one week prior to final PTC; 13) FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 4/13/2020 at 11:30 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood; 14) JURY TRIAL set for 5/5/2020 at 9:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/6/2019.(STC)cc: COR,D,JC
August 6, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (STC)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Almasalkhi, Aida)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) parties meet w/in 21 days; exchange disclosures; (2) Rule 26 Meeting Report due w/in 10 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/19/19.(KJR)cc: COR
July 19, 2019 NOTICE OF FEE REFUND APPROVED re #6 Order on Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically ; the fee transaction involving Receipt No. 0643-4402113 having been erroneously paid, the Clerk APPROVES the refund by processing a credit through the electronic credit card system. The credit refund transaction in the amount of $ $400.00 was successfully completed on 7/19/19 at 9:51 am. cc: COR (KJR)
July 19, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #7 Answer to Complaint (KJR)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgment by Michelle N. Armstrong, Patrick B. Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-model number, VIN)(Coan, Marvin)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: GRANTING pla's #5 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/16/19. (KJR)cc: COR, Finance
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically (Almasalkhi, Aida)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company of America, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation for Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.. (MM) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/5/2019) (SKV).
July 3, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MM)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Michelle N. Armstrong, Patrick B. Armstrong; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Michelle Armstrong)(MM)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4402222), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance policy, #2 Summons Patrick Armstrong, #3 Summons Michelle Armstrong, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(MM) Modified description of Exhibit A 7/5/2019 (MM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois v. Armstrong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick B. Armstrong
Represented By: Marvin L. Coan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle N. Armstrong
Represented By: Marvin L. Coan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Aida Almasalkhi
Represented By: Charles H. Cassis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?