Long v. Lowe's Home Center, LLC - Store 1622
Plaintiff: Betty Jo Long
Defendant: Lowe's Home Center, LLC - Store 1622
Case Number: 5:2019cv00271
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Lowe's Home Center, LLC - Store 1622 of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosure (Mays, Laura)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Betty Jo Long.(Thomas, David)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 7/30/2019.(SLH)cc: COR
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED NOTICE to Take Deposition of STEVE GIFFORD on SEPTEMBER 26, 2019 @ 1:00 P.M. by Lowe's Home Center, LLC - Store 1622.(Mays, Laura)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE to Take Deposition of BETTY JO LONG on SEPTEMBER 26, 2019 @ 10:30 A.M. by Lowe's Home Center, LLC - Store 1622.(Mays, Laura)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED as follows: 1. All discovery disputes are REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge (Atkins) assigned to this matter for appropriate resolution; No motions to compel or any motions relating to a discovery dispute shall be filed without permission as directed herein; 2. Court encourages early and economic case resolution. 3. Initial disclosures due NLT 8/30/19. 4. That all motions to amend pleadings and join additional parties shall be filed by the Plaintiff on or before September 27,2019, and by the Defendant on or before October 11, 2019. 5. Fact Discovery due by 5/29/2020, and expert/opinion discovery by 8/28/2020. 6. Identity of and reports from experts or opinion witnesses pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2) shall be disclosed by the Plaintiff on or before June 30, 2020, by the Defendant on or before July 31, 2020. Supplementation of reports shall be made as required by Rule 26(e). 7. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2020. 8. Motions in limine/Daubert due by 9/30/2020. 9. Motions for extensions of time or to modify this order shall be referred to the undersigned for disposition. 10. Parties shall adhere to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as noted in order. 11. Motion practice governed by LR 7.1. except as otherwise provided in this order. 12. At least 1 week before the final PTC, counsel shall: a. file exhibit lists, b. premark & display exhibits, c. file witness lists, d. file pretrial memorandum, e. file agreed proposed jury instructions. 13. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 12/7/2020 at 11:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood. 14. JURY TRIAL set for 1/12/2021 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood (2-3 days). Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/23/19. (JLM)cc: COR,JC,D
July 23, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #5 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (JLM)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to Take Deposition of STEVE GIFFORD on SEPTEMBER 25, 2019 @ 1:00 P.M. by Lowe's Home Center, LLC - Store 1622.(Mays, Laura)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to Take Deposition of BETTY JO LONG on SEPTEMBER 25, 2019 @ 10:00 A.M. by Lowe's Home Center, LLC - Store 1622.(Mays, Laura)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mays, Laura)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: 1) w/in 21 days, parties meet to discuss nature and basis of claims and defenses and possibilities for prompt resolution of case, make FRCP 26(a)(1) disclosures and develop proposed discovery plan; 2) w/in 10 days after meeting, file joint status report as outlined in Order. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/5/19.(JLM)cc: COR
July 3, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MM)
July 3, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lowe's Home Center, LLC - Store 1622. Filed in State Court Record - See #1 (MM)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURES by Lowe's Home Center, LLC - Store 1622.(Mays, Laura)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boyle Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-153. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4402269), filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC - Store 1622. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Pl's Discovery Response, #3 Exhibit C State Court Answer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(MM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Lowe's Home Center, LLC - Store 1622
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Jo Long
Represented By: David W. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Center, LLC - Store 1622
Represented By: Laura Leigh Mays
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Kissel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?