Broadway Electric Service Corporation v. SureTec Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Broadway Electric Service Corporation
Defendant: SureTec Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00276
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Broadway Electric Service Corporation; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JJ)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING by Broadway Electric Service Corporation re #1 Complaint, of Summons in a Civil Action (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Arnzen, Mark)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadway Electric Service Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Broadway Electric Service Corporation for Broadway Electric Service Corporation.. (Arnzen, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Mark G. Arnzen, Jr.. #1 Complaint, has been filed by Broadway Electric Service Corporation without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SLH)
July 11, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SLH)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4407912), filed by Broadway Electric Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Payment Bond, #2 Exhibit B- Standard Form of Agreement Between Contractor and Subcontractor, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadway Electric Service Corporation v. SureTec Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SureTec Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadway Electric Service Corporation
Represented By: Mark G. Arnzen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?