Truck and Auto v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: George W. N. Clay and Truck and Auto Extras, LLC
Defendant: Central Forms Solutions, LLC, Sled Pull Central, LLC, Marty K. Anderson, Big Ass Diesel Truck & Auto Extras, LLC and Central Forms, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00280
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Marty K. Anderson, Big Ass Diesel Truck & Auto Extras, LLC, Central Forms Solutions, LLC, Central Forms, LLC, Sled Pull Central, LLC filed by George W. N. Clay, Truck and Auto Extras, LLC. (Montague, William)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Court GRANTS #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and EXTENDS Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to 9/9/19. Defendants shall have 14 days from response to reply. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 9/5/2019.(GLD)cc: COR
September 5, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Wier for review: re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by George W. N. Clay, Truck and Auto Extras, LLC (STC)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by George W. N. Clay, Truck and Auto Extras, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montague, William)
September 4, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Wier for review: re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Marty K. Anderson, Big Ass Diesel Truck & Auto Extras, LLC, Central Forms Solutions, LLC, Central Forms, LLC, Sled Pull Central, LLC (STC)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Big Ass Diesel Truck & Auto Extras, LLC, Central Forms Solutions, LLC, Central Forms, LLC, Sled Pull Central, LLC. (Francis, James)
August 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Marty K. Anderson, Big Ass Diesel Truck & Auto Extras, LLC, Central Forms Solutions, LLC, Central Forms, LLC, Sled Pull Central, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Montague E-mail, #3 Proposed Order)(Francis, James)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Truck and Auto Extras, LLC, George W. N. Clay via authorized acceptance by defendants' counsel to All Defendants on 7/22/19; Answer due 8/12/19. (Attachments: #1 Summons Marty K. Anderson, #2 Summons Big Ass Diesel Truck & Auto Extras, LLC, #3 Summons Central Forms, LLC, #4 Summons Central Forms Solutions, LLC, #5 Summons Sled Pull Central, LLC)(Montague, William) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (KJR).
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. cc: form e-mailed to Register. (KJR)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Big Ass Diesel Truck & Auto Extras, LLC, #2 Summons Sled Pull Central, LLC, #3 Summons Central Forms, LLC, #4 Summons Central Forms Solutions, LLC)(MDC)
July 12, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Truck and Auto Extras, LLC. (MDC)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4409441), filed by Truck and Auto Extras, LLC, George W. N. Clay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bill of Sale, #2 Exhibit B - Anderson Email, #3 Exhibit C - Montague Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Francis Email, #5 Summons Marty K. Anderson, #6 Summons Big Ass Diesel Truck & Auto Extras, LLC, #7 Summons Sled Pull Central, LLC, #8 Summons Central Forms, LLC, #9 Summons Central Forms Solutions, LLC, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truck and Auto v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Forms Solutions, LLC
Represented By: James M. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sled Pull Central, LLC
Represented By: James M. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty K. Anderson
Represented By: James M. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Ass Diesel Truck & Auto Extras, LLC
Represented By: James M. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Forms, LLC
Represented By: James M. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George W. N. Clay
Represented By: William L. Montague, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truck and Auto Extras, LLC
Represented By: William L. Montague, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?