USA v. 21,020.00 in United States Currency
Petitioner: USA
Respondent: 21,020.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Donte Woodward
Case Number: 5:2019cv00283
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: It is ORDERED that Attorney Jacek W. Lentz to SHOW CAUSE within 14 days of the entry of this Order why he has not complied with the Court's order and why he should not be removed as counsel of record. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/4/2019.(KM)cc: COR, Attorney Lentz via U.S. mail
August 30, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: #4 Notice to Attorney - no response (KM)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Jacek W. Lentz by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Bar Status Check)(KM)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: GRANTING the parties' #1 JOINT Motion for Extension of Time; the date by which the United States is required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the property is EXTENDED to 9/23/19. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 7/17/19. (KJR)cc: COR, Atty Lentz (US Mail) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (KJR).
July 16, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
July 16, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: re #1 MOTION for Extension of Time by USA (MDC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Extension of Time by USA (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 21,020.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: 21,020.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: USA
Represented By: Rajbir Datta, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Donte Woodward
Represented By: Jacek W Lentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?