Myers v. Red Classic Transit, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Susan Myers
Defendant: William Stinson, Red Classic Transit, LLC and Coca-Cola Consolidated
Case Number: 5:2019cv00311
Filed: August 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #9 REPLY to Defendants' Response to Order to Show Cause (SLH)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Defendants' Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Susan Myers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Childers, Joe)
September 4, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #8 Response to Order to Show Cause (SLH)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Coca-Cola Consolidated, Red Classic Transit, LLC, William Stinson #4 filed by Coca-Cola Consolidated, Red Classic Transit, LLC, William Stinson. (Rusie, Jennifer)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Defendant's #6 MOTION to Hold Responsive Pleading in Abeyance re #1 Notice of Removal is GRANTED; and Defendant's Responsive pleading be held in abeyance until after the Court has ruled on its Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/14/2019.(SLH)cc: COR
August 13, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #6 MOTION to Hold Responsive Pleading in Abeyance re #1 Notice of Removal, by William Stinson (JLM)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Hold Responsive Pleading in Abeyance re #1 Notice of Removal,, by William Stinson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Defendant Stinson's Motion to Hold Responsive Pleading in Abeyance)(Rusie, Jennifer)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Red Classic Transit, LLC.(Rusie, Jennifer)
August 6, 2019 Clerk's Note: DE 5 Order was docketed in error & has been deleted. (KJR)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: 1. Defendants SHALL SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded to Fayette Circuit Court; 2. Defendants SHALL SHOW CAUSE on or before 8/21/2019; 3. Plaintiff SHALL RESPOND on or before 9/5/2019; 4. Defendants SHALL file any reply on or before 9/13/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/6/2019.(SLH)cc: COR
August 6, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SLH)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Jennifer S. Rusie has been filed by Red Classic Transit, LLC and Coca-Cola Consolidated without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. Red Classic Transit, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Myers
Represented By: Bethany Nicole Baxter
Represented By: Joe F. Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Stinson
Represented By: Jennifer S. Rusie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Classic Transit, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer S. Rusie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Consolidated
Represented By: Jennifer S. Rusie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?