USA v. Lawson et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Tasha Lawson and Eric Lawson
Case Number: 5:2019cv00326
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: (1) USA's #9 Motion for warning order attorney is GRANTED. (2) This Court hereby appoints Attorney Donald D. Waggener for the Defendant Eric Lawson. (3) WOA shall make diligent efforts to inform defendant by mail, and must report his/her efforts within 50 days. (4) If WOA cannot inform the defendant. he shall so report to the Court. (5) Plaintiff's shall deliver a copy of the complaint, Plaintiff's motion, and this Order to the WOA. (6) WOA may also file a motion and affidavit for payment of the WOA's fee and expenses. (7) Plaintiff's payment policies for said WOA's fee and expenses require 60 days for payment. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/3/2019. (JJ)cc: COR
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST MOTION for warning order attorney by USA Eric Lawson (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Aff in Spt of MTN for WOA - Eric Lawson, #2 Proposed Order Proposed ORD for WOA - Eric Lawson)(Thompson, Travis)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by USA as to Eric Lawson. (Thompson, Travis)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via certified mail to Tasha Lawson served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Thompson, Travis)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Eric Lawson, Tasha Lawson; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Tasha Lawson)(JJ)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by USA as to Tasha Lawson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Alias Summons - Tasha Lawson)(Thompson, Travis)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted by USA as to Eric Lawson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Alias Summons - Eric Lawson)(Thompson, Travis)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Tasha Lawson)(MDC)
August 13, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4437183), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage for Kentucky, #3 Exhibit C - Subsidy Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Prood, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Eric Lawson, #7 Summons Tasha Lawson)(MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Lawson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasha Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Lawson
Represented By: Donald D. Waggener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Travis W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?