USA v. Sallie et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Tim Sallie, Capital One Bank NKA Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Aimee Sallie Smith and Capital One Bank
Case Number: 5:2019cv00331
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF SALE: RE #10 Motion for Judgment; Motion for Order of Sale by USA. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 9/26/19. (JLM)cc: COR,USM
September 26, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Wier for review: re #10 MOTION for Judgment by USA MOTION for Order of Sale by USA (JLM)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment by USA , MOTION for Order of Sale by USA (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mason, A.)
September 19, 2019 Clerk's Note: Docket Entry #10 was made in error and has been deleted. (SLH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Capital One Bank, Tim Sallie, Aimee Sallie Smith #8 MOTION for Entry of Default by USA cc: COR (SLH)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default by USA (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of A. George Mason, Jr., #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Kimberly Williamson, #3 Proposed Order)(Mason, A.)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file either an apt motion (reflective of case status), or general case status report WITHIN 10 DAYS. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 9/17/2019.(SLH)cc: COR
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Capital One Bank NKA Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Certified Mail Receipt, #2 Receipt USPS Tracking)(Mason, A.)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Aimee Sallie Smith served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Certified Mail Receipt)(Mason, A.)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Tim Sallie served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Certified Mail Receipt)(Mason, A.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Aimee Sallie Smith, #2 Summons Capital One Bank)(MDC)
August 14, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4438878), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B - Mortgage for KY, #4 Exhibit C - Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #5 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Kimberly Williamson, #6 Exhibit E - Capital One Lien, #7 Summons Tim Sallie, #8 Summons Aimee Sallie Smith, #9 Summons Capital One Bank)(MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Sallie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Sallie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank NKA Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aimee Sallie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: A. George Mason, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?