Elmore v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Matthew Elmore
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00355
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Clerk's Note: Case transferred has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-06054 re #7 Certified Order. (STC) Modified on 10/4/2019 (STC).
September 24, 2019 Clerk's Note: JPMDL information extracted re #7 Order, Case Transferred to MDL and electronically transmitted to AO. (SKV)
September 23, 2019 Clerk's Note: Case extracted and transferred electronically via CM/ECF to Northern District of California re #7 Certified Order. (STC)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED ORDER received from Northern District of California re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. 152 filed in MDL Case Number 2741 (STC)cc: COR
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2741 (SLH)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. Within 21 days, parties shall meet to consider the topics Rule 26(f)(2) mandates. 2. Within 14 days of the meeting, parties shall file a joint written report. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 9/17/2019.(JJ)cc: COR
September 13, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Wier for review: #4 Answer to Amended Complaint (KJR)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Monsanto Company.(Browning, Carol)
September 9, 2019 Clerk's Note: e-mail sent to MDL panel re #1 Notice of Removal for review. Possible related case: MDL 2741. (SLH)
September 9, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SLH)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company.. (SLH)
September 9, 2019 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Monsanto Company, filed by Matthew Elmore. FILED IN STATE COURT RECORD. SEE DE #1 (SLH)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mercer Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00205. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4459437), filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elmore v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Elmore
Represented By: Daniel Vincent Smith
Represented By: Christopher D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Represented By: Zachary Myers VanVactor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?