Kleber v. Gilbert et al
Plaintiff: Kendra S. Kleber
Defendant: The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C, David karman and Gary M. Gilbert
Case Number: 5:2019cv00367
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kendra S. Kleber (MDC)
October 23, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #8 Order For Meeting and Report. No Joint Status Report filed. (MDC)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kendra S. Kleber (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Remand to State Court, #2 Affidavit of Clarification, #3 Proposed Order Remanding to State Court)(Butcher, Steven)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED as follows: (1) Within 21 days from the date of service of this order, parties shall meet to discuss the nature and basis of their claims & defenses and possibilities for a settlement or resolution of the case. (2) Within 10 days after meeting parties shall file a joint status report containing: a)the discovery plan; b) parties' estimate of time necessary to file pretrial motions; c) probably length of trial; d) dates mutually convenient for trial; e) decision as to whether the action may be referred to a US Magistrate Judge; f) determination whether resolution of case may be aided by mediation or other special procedures. Each party is directed to advise the Court at the time of the submission of the joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners w/ which it is associated, to the extent the party has not already done so. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 09/19/2019. (MDC) cc: COR
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint of Kendra S. Kleber, COUNTERCLAIM of The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C. against Kendra S. Kleber by David Karman, Gary M. Gilbert, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement)(Finley, Kenneth)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1) Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Sean T. Needham to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED; 2) Sean T. Needham shall be admitted to appear pro hac vice as counsel for by Defendants Gary M. Gilbert, David Karman, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C.; and 3) Sean T. Needham shall be subject to the jurisdiction and rules of the Kentucky Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/16/2019. (JJ)cc: COR, Needham w/ ECF Registration Form
September 16, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #5 MOTION for Sean T. Needham to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gary M. Gilbert, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C, David karman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4464645) (KM)
September 16, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Sean T. Needham re #5 MOTION for Sean T. Needham to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gary M. Gilbert, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C, David karman (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4464645). (KM)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Sean T. Needham to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gary M. Gilbert, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C, David karman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4464645) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Finley, Kenneth)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gary M. Gilbert, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C, David karman. (Finley, Kenneth)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Kenneth L. Finley & Anthony Pernice has been filed by The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (MDC)
September 11, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-2707. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4462187), filed by David karman, Gary M. Gilbert, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kleber v. Gilbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C
Represented By: Anthony Pernice
Represented By: Kenneth L. Finley
Represented By: Sean T. Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David karman
Represented By: Anthony Pernice
Represented By: Kenneth L. Finley
Represented By: Sean T. Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary M. Gilbert
Represented By: Anthony Pernice
Represented By: Kenneth L. Finley
Represented By: Sean T. Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra S. Kleber
Represented By: Gregory E.J. Coulson
Represented By: Steven Chad Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?