Phillips et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Dereck Phillips and Stephanie Phillips
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00368
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C.R. Bard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bird, Melissa)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Sally Rose Bage by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application via U.S. Mail. (GLD)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY James R. Condo by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application via U.S. Mail. (GLD)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Leslie MacLean by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application via U.S. Mail. (GLD)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Upon agreement by the Judges, IT IS ORDERED that this matter be reassigned to Honorable Judge Joseph M. Hood for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/25/2019.(GLD)cc: COR
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C.R. Bard, Inc. of Substitution of Counsel (Bird, Melissa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Submission of Records re Remanded Cases by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C.R. Bard, Inc., Dereck Phillips, Stephanie Phillips NOTE: Please see Master Docket Sheet in United States District Court at Arizona Number 2:15-md-2641 for individual documents related to this MDL. (Attachments: #1 MDL 2641 Master Case Docket Sheet)(CBD)
September 11, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
September 6, 2019 Remark: Case Transferred to the Eastern District of Kentucky. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/11/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/11/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/11/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-02922-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/11/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16886239 filed by Stephanie Phillips, Dereck Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: James R. Condo
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: James R. Condo
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Megan Basham Davis
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Condo
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Megan Basham Davis
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dereck Phillips
Represented By: Leslie MacLean
Represented By: Sally Rose Bage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Phillips
Represented By: Leslie MacLean
Represented By: Sally Rose Bage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?