Mace v. Akers et al
Plaintiff: Roy R. Mace, III
Defendant: Sgt. Daniel Akers, Lynn Childers and L.T. Troy Wilson
Case Number: 5:2019cv00381
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(SLH)
September 19, 2019 Conflict Check run. (STC)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 1:19-cv-00105. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. cc: Plt w/ copy of docket sheet
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 9/18/2019. IT IS ORDERED that the instant action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Central Division, at Lexington pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) for all further proceedings. All further filings shall be filed with that court. Should further filings be filed in this Court, the Clerk of Court shall transfer the filings to the Eastern District of Kentucky. cc: Plaintiff, pro se (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 9/19/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Roy R. Mace III inquiring as to status of case. (Docket report mailed to Mr. Mace this date.) (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 9/19/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Roy R. Mace, III (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 9/19/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 9/19/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Akers, Lynn Childers, Troy Wilson, filed by Roy R. Mace, III, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments, #2 Summons) (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 9/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mace v. Akers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Daniel Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.T. Troy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy R. Mace, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?