Dana Incorporated v. The International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and AgriculturalImplement Workers of America, Local Union No. 3062
Plaintiff: Dana Incorporated
Defendant: The International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Local Union No. 3062
Case Number: 5:2019cv00445
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. Simultaneous Motions for Summary Judgment shall be filed by each party ON OR BEFORE 2/14/2020; 2. Reponses from both parties shall be filed ON OR BEFORE 3/17/2020; 3. Replies from both parties shall be filed ON OR BEFORE 4/7/2020. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/3/2020.(SLH)cc: COR
January 3, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Claria H. Boom for review: #11 JOINT Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (SLH)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Priddy, Alton)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: Parties shall meet w/in 21 DAYS of this order pursuant to Rule 26(f); 2. W/in 14 DAYS of meeting, parties shall file a written joint report advising court of items listed within this order; 3. 7.1 disclosure statement shall be filed at time of joint status report. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 12/6/2019.(SLH)cc: COR (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2019: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge Form) (SLH).
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Dana Incorporated.(Dershaw, Brian)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dana Incorporated. (Dershaw, Brian)
December 2, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Claria H. Boom for review: #1 Complaint, #6 Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim (SLH)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by The International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Local Union No. 3062. (Priddy, Alton)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Dana Incorporated by The International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Local Union No. 3062.(Schulz, Thomas)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dana Incorporated. All Defendants. (Dershaw, Brian)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Brian G. Dershaw has been filed by Dana Incorporated without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SLH)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Local Union No. 3062 ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (SLH)
November 12, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SLH)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4518562), filed by Dana Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Relevant portions of CBA, #2 Exhibit B- LCA, #3 Exhibit C- Grievance documents, #4 Exhibit D- Dana's brief, #5 Exhibit E- Union's brief, #6 Exhibit F- Arbitration Award, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Local Union No. 3062)(SLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dana Incorporated v. The International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and AgriculturalImplement Workers of America, Local Union No. 3062
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Local Union No. 3062
Represented By: Thomas J. Schulz
Represented By: Alton D. Priddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Incorporated
Represented By: Brian G. Dershaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?