Pendermon v. Moore et al
Plaintiff: Andre S. Pendermon
Defendant: Brittney Moore, Thomas Jones, Tammy Allen and Steve Tussey
Case Number: 5:2019cv00452
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Attorney Update. Attorney Lynn Sowards Zellen for Tammy Allen,Lynn Sowards Zellen for Thomas Jones,Lynn Sowards Zellen for Steve Tussey added. (JLM)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Tammy Allen, Thomas Jones, Steve Tussey.(Stilz, D.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed via Personal Service to Thomas Jones served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (JLM)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed via Personal Service to Steve Tussey served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (JLM)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed via Personal Service to Tammy Allen served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (JLM)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Tammy Allen, Thomas Jones, Brittney Moore, Steve Tussey. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (JLM)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1. granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court waives the separate $50.00 administrative fee. 2. The Clerk of the Court shall open an account in Pendermon's name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form (Form EDKY 525) and shall send the Notice and a copy of this Order to the warden of the institution in which Pendermon is confined. 3. Because Pendermon lacks sufficient funds from which to pay an initial partial filing fee, collection of that fee is DEFERRED. 4. For each month hereafter, if the amount in Pendermon's inmate account exceeds $10.00, his custodian shall deduct from Pendermons inmate account an amount equal to 20% of his income for the preceding month and remit that sum to the Clerk of the Court. The custodian shall continue such monthly payments until the entire $350.00 filing fee is paid. 5. A Deputy Clerk shall prepare a Service Packet for each defendant, including Head Nurse Brittney Moore, Chief Deputy Thomas Jones, Jailer Steve Tussey, and Class D Coordinator Tammy Allen. 6. The Deputy Clerk shall deliver the Service Packets to the USMS in Lexington, Kentucky and note the date of delivery in the docket. 7. The USMS shall make arrangements with the appropriate officials at the Montgomery County Regional Jail to personally serve Head Nurse Brittney Moore. 8. The USMS shall make arrangements with the appropriate officials at the Madison County Detention Center to personally serve Chief Deputy Thomas Jones, Jailer Steve Tussey, and Class D Coordinator Tammy Allen. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/3/19. (JLM)cc: COR,Finance,USMS via hand delivery,Warden at Montgomery County Regional Jail (with Notice of Payment Form) via U.S. mail, Pendermon via U.S. mail
December 2, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre S. Pendermon (pro se) (SLH)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Andre S. Pendermon (pro se) (SLH)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre S. Pendermon (pro se) Motions referred to P SO (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 11/25/2019)(SLH)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1. denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; 2. The Clerk of the Court shall send Pendermon an Affidavit of Assets / In Forma Pauperis Application [Form AO-240] and a Certificate of Inmate Account [EDKY Form 523]; 3. Pendermon must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and the $50.00 administrative fee or (1) have the Certificate of Inmate Account certified by prison staff; (2) complete the Affidavit of Assets / In Forma Pauperis Application; and (3) file both of these documents with this Court; 4. Pendermon must take these steps within 28 days or his case will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/18/19. (JLM)cc: COR,Pendermon w/forms via U.S. mail.
November 15, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review (JLM)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (JLM)
November 15, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre S. Pendermon, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (JLM)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to PSO, filed by Andre S. Pendermon, pro se. (Attachments: #1 envelope postmarked 11/13/19)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pendermon v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittney Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Jones
Represented By: D. Barry Stilz
Represented By: Lynn Sowards Zellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Allen
Represented By: D. Barry Stilz
Represented By: Lynn Sowards Zellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Tussey
Represented By: D. Barry Stilz
Represented By: Lynn Sowards Zellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre S. Pendermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?