Clouse et al v. Bluegrass Contractors, Inc. of Lexington
Plaintiff: Larry R. Whitaker, Jr., Alexis Mercado and Charles W. Clouse
Defendant: Bluegrass Contractors, Inc. of Lexington
Case Number: 5:2020cv00011
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Charles W. Clouse, Alexis Mercado, Larry R. Whitaker, Jr Notice of Filing Notices of Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms)(Garrison, David)
February 26, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bluegrass Contractors, Inc. of Lexington. (Wright, Derrick)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. w/in 21 DAYS parties shall meet to discuss nature of claims, defenses and possibilities of settlement required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1); 2. Parties shall file joint status report w/in 10 days of meeting. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/25/2020.(SLH)cc: COR
February 25, 2020 Filing 15 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bluegrass Contractors, Inc. of Lexington. (Lee, J.)
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bluegrass Contractors, Inc. of Lexington.(Lee, J.)
February 18, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #13 Notice of Consent (SLH)
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Charles W. Clouse, Alexis Mercado, Larry R. Whitaker, Jr Notice of Filing Notices of Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms)(Garrison, David)
February 14, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #12 Notice of Consent (SLH)
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Charles W. Clouse, Alexis Mercado, Larry R. Whitaker, Jr Notice of Filing Notice of Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Garrison, David)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION OF JOSHUA A. FRANK PRO HAC VICE: The #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED and Joshua A. Frank shall be admitted pro hac vice on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/13/2020. (KM)cc: COR
February 13, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #10 Notice of Consent (SLH)
February 13, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #9 MOTION for Joshua A. Frank to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles W. Clouse, Alexis Mercado, Larry R. Whitaker, Jr ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4594192) (SLH)
February 13, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed re #9 MOTION for Joshua A. Frank to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles W. Clouse, Alexis Mercado, Larry R. Whitaker, Jr ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4594192). (SLH)
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Charles W. Clouse, Alexis Mercado, Larry R. Whitaker, Jr Notice of Filing Notice of Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Garrison, David)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Joshua A. Frank to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles W. Clouse, Alexis Mercado, Larry R. Whitaker, Jr ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4594192) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Frank, Joshua)
February 11, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #8 Notice of Consent (SLH)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Charles W. Clouse, Alexis Mercado, Larry R. Whitaker, Jr Notice of Filing Notice of Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Garrison, David)
February 10, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #7 Notice of Filing Notice of Consent (SLH)
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Charles W. Clouse, Alexis Mercado, Larry R. Whitaker, Jr Notice of Filing Notices of Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms)(Garrison, David)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles W. Clouse, Alexis Mercado, Larry R. Whitaker, Jr via U.S. Certified Mail Return Receipt for Merchandise to Bluegrass Contractors, Inc. of Lexington served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Garrison, David)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE: By agreement of the parties, it is HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Bluegrass Contractors, Inc. of Lexington answer due 2/25/2020. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/4/2020.(SLH)cc: COR
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Deadline to Answer by Bluegrass Contractors, Inc. of Lexington. (Lee, J.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bluegrass Contractors, Inc. of Lexington; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (SLH)
January 10, 2020 Conflict Check run. (SLH)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4565422), filed by Charles W. Clouse, Alexis Mercado, Larry R. Whitaker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Clouse paystub, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons- Bluegrass Contractors, Inc. of Lexington)(SLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clouse et al v. Bluegrass Contractors, Inc. of Lexington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry R. Whitaker, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua A. Frank
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: John Christopher Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Mercado
Represented By: Joshua A. Frank
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: John Christopher Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W. Clouse
Represented By: Joshua A. Frank
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: John Christopher Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluegrass Contractors, Inc. of Lexington
Represented By: J. Stan Lee
Represented By: Derrick T. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?