Latham v. First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Latham
Defendant: First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00016
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. No motions to compel, nor motions relating to a discovery dispute, shall be filed unless COR has received permission from Judge; 2. Parties SHALL immediately assess any potential for agreed resolution. Parties may mediate through private mediator or request settlement conference with Mag. Judge. Matter will be ref to MJ at that time; 3. Dft shall produce to Pltf the complete administrative record NLT 3/18/2020; 4. Pltf shall serve discovery request by 4/3/2020; 5. Parties shall file a stipulation as to the applicable standard of review before 4/3/2020; 6. Pltf's motions to amend pleadings and join addition parties shall be filed by 4/10/2020; 7. Dft's motions to amend pleadings and join additional parties shall be filed by 4/24/2020; 8. Discovery due by 7/3/2020; 9. Parties' simultaneous briefs addressing Pltf's claim for benefits filed by 8/17/2020; 10. Responses to briefs shall be filed on or before 9/16/2020; 11. Motion practice shall be governed by LR 7.1; (a) Failure to respond to a motion shall be grounds for the Court to conclude that any arguments in opposition thereto have been waived. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/13/2020.(SLH)cc: COR Modified text on 2/13/2020 (SLH).
February 13, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (STC)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Thornsbury, Elizabeth)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1) w/in 21 days, parties meet to discuss nature and basis of claims and defenses and possibilities for prompt resolution of case, make FRCP 26(a) (1) disclosures and develop proposed discovery plan; 2) w/in 10 days after meeting, file joint status report as outlined in Order. 3) advise the Court at the time of the submission of the joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners with which it is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/17/20. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(JLM)cc: COR
January 17, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Answer to Complaint (JLM)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company.(O'Brien, Edward)
January 14, 2020 Conflict Check run. (KJR)
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company.. (KJR)
January 14, 2020 SUMMONS Returned Executed to First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company served on 12/27/2019. (attached to the #1 Notice of Removal) (KJR)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bourbon Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-276. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4567615), filed by First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 State Court Record service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KJR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latham v. First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Latham
Represented By: Erik David Peterson
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Thornsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?