Hackney v. International Crankshaft Inc.
Plaintiff: Randi Hackney
Defendant: International Crankshaft Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00027
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER: 1. NLT 21 days before PTC, counsel file witness lists, exhibit lists, motions in limine, transcripts of evidentiary depositions to be used at trial, pretrial memorandum, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire; 2. NLT that 14 days prior to PTC parties file written objections, responses to motions; 3. At PTC counsel shall be prepared to discuss stipulations of admissibility, disclose & display exhibits, discuss possibility of settlement, advise of technological issues that may arise at trial; 4. PTC shall be attended by all attorneys trying the case with parties or representatives. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/28/2020.(KM)cc: COR
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. The following deadlines shall be observed: a. Counsel exchanged Rule 26(a)(1) information by 3/16/2020; b. Motion to Join Additional Parties or amended pleadings due by 5/20/2020; c. Supplementation to disclosures as required; d. Expert reports due for plaintiff by 6/26/2020, for defendant by 8/28/2020; e. Discovery due by 10/2/2020; f. Dispositive Motions due by 11/6/2020; 2. No motions to compel or any motions relating to discovery dispute unless parties first conferred as directed; 3. The parties shall observe the directives listed herein regarding the filing of discovery materials; 4. No extension of the deadlines set in this order or those set in PT order shall be granted unless appropriate motion filed; 5. This matter set for TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 4/7/2020 at 10:30 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell; 6. Set for JURY TRIAL on 5/3/2021 at 01:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell, counsel present by 12:30 p.m. (4 days); IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge (Stinnett) chosen by random draw for purposes of managing all discovery and pretrial scheduling issues. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/28/2020.(KM)cc: COR,D,JC
February 25, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #7 JOINT REPORT Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MDC)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bame, Jennifer)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) ) W/in 21 days from the date of service of this order, parties shall meet to discuss the nature and basis of their claims & defenses and possibilities for a settlement or resolution of the case. 2) W/in 10 days after the meeting parties shall file a joint report containing: a) the discovery plan; b) parties' estimate of time necessary to file pretrial motions; c) the parties' belief as to whether the matter is suitable for some form of alternative dispute resolution such as mediation; d) probably length of trial; e) decision as to whether the action may be referred to a US Magistrate Judge; f) dates mutually convenient for trial. Each party is directed to advise the Court at the time of the submission of the joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners w/ which it is associated. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 02/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(MDC)cc: COR
February 13, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: #5 Answer to Complaint (STC)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by International Crankshaft Inc..(Bame, Jennifer)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by International Crankshaft Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Nippon Steel North America Inc., Other Affiliate Nippon Steel Corp., Other Affiliate Nippon Steel Crankshaft Management Inc., Other Affiliate Sumitomo Corp. for International Crankshaft Inc... (Bame, Jennifer)
January 28, 2020 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
January 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Jennifer L. Bame & John T. Lovett has been filed by International Crankshaft, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (MDC)
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Scott Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-73. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4578979), filed by International Crankshaft Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hackney v. International Crankshaft Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randi Hackney
Represented By: Jennifer L. McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Crankshaft Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Bame
Represented By: John T. Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?