Burns v. Berry Global, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ronald Burns
Defendant: Berry Global, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00044
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Megan R. USellis. #8 Answer to Complaint has been filed by BERRY GLOBAL, INC. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (MDC)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) Parties meet within 30 days. 2) Exchange Disclosure. 3) NLT 10 days after the meeting, written joint report including the following information: a) parties' views and proposals; b) parties' estimate of time necessary to join other parties and to amend the pleadings; c) length of time necessary to file motions; d) length of time necessary to complete all pretrial discovery, including expert witness discovery; e) length of time necessary for the parties to make expert disclosures; f) probable length of trial; g) dates mutually convenient for trial; h) whether the parties desire a scheduling conference before entry of a scheduling order; and i) decision as to whether the action may be referred to a USMJ. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 03/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form) (MDC) cc: COR
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Berry Global, Inc..(U'Sellis, Megan) Modified text on 3/23/2020 (MDC).
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Berry Global, Inc.. (U'Sellis, Megan)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The #4 Agreed Order for Extension of Time, docketed as a motion, is GRANTED. Dft shall have until 03/20/2020 to file a responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 02/26/2020. (MDC) cc: COR
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Berry Global, Inc.. (U'Sellis, Megan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time in which to file Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Berry Global, Inc.. (U'Sellis, Megan)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Berry Global, Inc. ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (MDC)
February 6, 2020 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4588196), filed by Ronald Burns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photo of Note, #2 Exhibit B - Photo of Locker, #3 Exhibit C - Photo of Note, #4 Exhibit D - Photo, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Berry Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berry Global, Inc.
Represented By: Megan R. U'Sellis
Represented By: Ashby M. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Burns
Represented By: Katherine Jeanelle Hornback
Represented By: Daniel Clarke Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?