Delta T, LLC v. MacroAir Technologies Inc.
Plaintiff: Delta T, LLC
Defendant: MacroAir Technologies Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00144
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to MacroAir Technologies Inc. COMPLETED on 5/20/2020. Secretary of State return states: "This office served the Dft by sending a copy of the summons and accompanying documents via certified mail" (MDC)
May 12, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Delta T, LLC. MacroAir Technologies Inc. waiver sent on 5/9/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (Hunter, Barry)
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #11 Summons Issued. (MDC)
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to MacroAir Technologies Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Secretary of State. (JJ)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING by Delta T, LLC Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hunter, Barry)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: granting #8 Motion for Atty Jennifer L. Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Delta T, LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 04/09/2020. (MDC) cc: COR and Jennifer L. Barry by US Mail (Order + Electronic Filing Atty Registration Form)
April 9, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #8 MOTION for Jennifer L. Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Delta T, LLC (JJ)
April 9, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Jennifer L. Barry re #8 MOTION for Jennifer L. Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Delta T, LLC . (JJ)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Jennifer L. Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Delta T, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4640390) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Barry, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Hunter, Barry)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Jennifer L. Barry by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (MDC)
April 6, 2020 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 1:20-cv-00055. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered filer
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/6/2020. A review of the record in this action indicates that this action belongs in the Eastern District of Kentucky because the plaintiff is located in Lexington, Kentucky, IT IS ORDERED that this action is TRANSFERRED to the docket of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky for re-allotment to a judge assigned in that division. L.R. 3.2(f). All further filings shall be filed with that court. Following transfer, the docket shall reflect that the matter in this District is closed. cc: Counsel; Defendant (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 4/6/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Big Ass Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent Goldberg Lindsay & Co. a/k/a Lindsay Goldberg, Other Affiliate Lindsay Goldberg for Delta T, LLC. by Delta T, LLC. (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 4/6/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 4/6/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MacroAir Technologies Inc., filed by Delta T, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3076270. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 4/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta T, LLC v. MacroAir Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta T, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer L. Barry
Represented By: Barry D. Hunter
Represented By: Medrith Lee Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacroAir Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?