Doe v. Transylvania University
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Transylvania University
Case Number: 5:2020cv00145
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Transylvania University, filed by John Doe.(Murphy, Kevin)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #20 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time by Transylvania University. The time within which the defendant may respond to the Complaint is extended through May 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/27/2020.(SLH)cc: COR
April 27, 2020 Filing 20 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time by Transylvania University. (Beauman, Bryan)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: ORDERED as follows: 1) Pla John Doe's #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or temporary Injunction is DENIED. 2) Pla John Doe's #6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 04/13/2020. (MDC) cc: COR
April 13, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by John Doe (JJ)
April 10, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Sexual Misconduct Policy, #2 Exhibit B-March 27, 2020 letter from Transylvania University)(Murphy, Kevin)
April 10, 2020 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM REGARDING METHOD OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING re #10 Response to Motion, #15 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing filed by Transylvania University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. G Suite for Education (Online) Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2. Transylvania Virtual Hearing Protocol)(Beauman, Bryan) Modified text on 4/10/2020 (SLH).
April 9, 2020 Filing 16 Exhibit and Witness List for Motion Hearing held 4/9/2020. (KM)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR MOTIONS HEARING held on 4/9/2020 before Judge Danny C. Reeves: It is ORDERED as follows: 1. Counsel for dft shall have until 4/10/2020 at noon to submit a supplemental memorandum addressing the manner in which the university plans to conduct the video conference hearing scheduled for 4/15/2020; 2. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Order for Preliminary Injunction #5 and Motion for Expedited Discovery #6 are TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves. (Court Reporter Lisa Wiesman.) (KM)cc: COR
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT Sealed pursuant to MOTION TO SEAL re 13 Order on Motion for leave to Seal Document, #10 Response to Motion by Transylvania University (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Final Investigative Report, #2 Exhibit 2. Letter regarding Notice of Investigation, #3 Exhibit 3. Email regarding Notice of Investigation, #4 Exhibit 4. Email- Re: Meeting Tomorrow, #5 Exhibit 5. Email- Re: Follow Up Information, #6 Exhibit 6. Email- Room Guests, #7 Exhibit 7. Respondent Initial Statement, #8 Exhibit 8. Email- Re: [John Doe], #9 Exhibit 9. Email- Re: Redacted Emails, #10 Exhibit 10. Email- Re: Possible Witness Question, #11 Exhibit 11. Respondent follow-up, #12 Exhibit 12. Email- Re: our pre-hearing phone conference, #13 Exhibit 13. Investigative Report Letter, #14 Exhibit 14. Maxient Report, #15 Exhibit 15. Email: Re: Email Question, #16 Exhibit 16. Email- Re: Incident Report, #17 Exhibit 17. 2-26 Follow Up Letter, #18 Exhibit 18. Email- Re: Request to Review, #19 Exhibit 19. Email- Re: [John Doe], #20 Exhibit 20. Email- Confirmation of Hearing Date, #21 Exhibit 21. Email- Inquiry Letter with Attachments, #22 Exhibit 22. Final Report, #23 Exhibit 23. Email of 3/27/20 from Morgan to Murphy) (Beauman, Bryan)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #11 Motion for leave to Seal Document #10 Response to Motion by Transylvania University. Good cause has been demonstrated for filing defendant's exhibits under seal. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/9/2020. (SLH)cc: COR
April 8, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Expedite by John Doe filed by Transylvania University. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beauman, Bryan)
April 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to Seal a Document #10 Response to Motion by Transylvania University (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beauman, Bryan)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by John Doe filed by Transylvania University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-23 To Be Filed Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Beauman, Bryan)
April 8, 2020 Conflict Check run. (KJR)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Transylvania University. (Beauman, Bryan)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #3 Motion for leave to Seal Document by John Doe. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/7/2020. (SLH)cc: COR
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. Hearing set for 4/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves re #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and #6 MOTION to Expedite; 2. COR for pltf shall make his best effort to inform dft concerning the date, time, location and nature of hearing; 3. Clerk of the Court shall notify the dft's listed atty, Bryan H. Beauman, of this hearing via e-mail and by telephone. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/7/2020.(SLH)cc: COR,D, Beauman (email and phone)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite by John Doe (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Kevin)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by John Doe (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A-3/27/20 letter from Transylvania University, #3 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Kevin)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT Sealed pursuant to MOTION TO SEAL re #3 MOTION for leave to Seal a Document by John Doe by John Doe (Murphy, Kevin)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to Seal a Document by John Doe (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Kevin)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4638463), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- 3/27 letter from Transylvania)(SLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Transylvania University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transylvania University
Represented By: Bryan Howard Beauman
Represented By: Donald C. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Kevin L. Murphy
Represented By: Steven A. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?