Walters v. Lexington-Fayette County Urban County Government et al
Plaintiff: Larry Michael Walters
Defendant: Steve Haney, Lexington-Fayette County Urban County Government, Unknown Doctors, Nurses, & Medical Care Providers of Corizon Health, Inc., Corizon Health, Inc., Michelle Welling and Unknown Employees and/or Agents of the Fayette County Detention Center
Case Number: 5:2020cv00169
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Leave to File by Larry Michael Walters Amended Complaint filed by Corizon Health, Inc., Unknown Doctors, Nurses, & Medical Care Providers of Corizon Health, Inc., Michelle Welling. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ragland, David)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Leave to File by Larry Michael Walters Amended Complaint Joint Response in Oppostion filed by Steve Haney, Lexington-Fayette County Urban County Government. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Roger)
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevan Morgan. (Morgan, Kevan)
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File by Larry Michael Walters Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Francis, James) Modified text on 6/1/2020 (JJ).
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a memorandum in response to Defendant's #6 Motion to Dismiss on or before 5/29/2020. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/19/2020.(JJ)cc: COR
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Agreed Order by Larry Michael Walters. (Francis, James)
April 30, 2020 Case no longer referred to P SO. * (Per Chambers). (MDC)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Steve Haney, Lexington-Fayette County Urban County Government And Supporting Memorandum Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Roger)
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Steve Haney re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Consent to Removal (Wright, Roger)
April 23, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of P SO for review: (MDC)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Corizon Health, Inc., Unknown Doctors, Nurses, & Medical Care Providers of Corizon Health, Inc., Michelle Welling. (Ragland, David)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Corizon Health, Inc., Unknown Doctors, Nurses, & Medical Care Providers of Corizon Health, Inc., Michelle Welling. (Ragland, David)
April 23, 2020 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Michael Walters via certified mail to Corizon Health, Inc. served on 4/3/2020, answer due 4/24/2020. (JJ)
April 23, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Corizon Health, Inc., Michelle Welling. See DE #1 -1 for filing of Answer in the State Court Record. (JJ)
April 23, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Co. Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00966. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4652978), filed by Corizon Health, Inc., Michelle Welling, Unknown Doctors, Nurses, & Medical Care Providers of Corizon Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walters v. Lexington-Fayette County Urban County Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Michael Walters
Represented By: James M. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington-Fayette County Urban County Government
Represented By: Roger G. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Doctors, Nurses, & Medical Care Providers of Corizon Health, Inc.
Represented By: Colleen O. Davis
Represented By: David Sean Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health, Inc.
Represented By: Colleen O. Davis
Represented By: David Sean Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Welling
Represented By: Colleen O. Davis
Represented By: David Sean Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Employees and/or Agents of the Fayette County Detention Center
Represented By: Roger G. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?