Hagyard-Davison-McGee Associates , PLLC et al v. Chubb Group of Insurance Companies et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Stivers, HDM Pharmacy, LLC, Stewart Brown, II, Arnaldo Monge, James Schalnus, Michael Hore, Luke Fallon, Kenneth Canterbury, Hagyard-Davison-McGee Associates, PLLC, Michael Spirito, Kevin Pfiester, Karen Wolfsdorf, Dwayne Rodgerson, Jeffrey Pumphrey, Nathan Slovis, Robert Hunt, Ernest Martinez, II, HDM Holdings, Inc. and Rhonda O'Rourke
Defendant: The Chubb Corporation, Chubb Group of Insurance Companies, Federal Insurance Company, J. Smith Lanier & Co., John B. Milward, Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, John K. Milward and Chubb National Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00171
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss by Federal Insurance Company Chubb Defendants, #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Stewart Brown, II, Kenneth Canterbury, Luke Fallon, HDM Holdings, Inc., HDM Pharmacy, LLC, Hagyard-Davison-McGee Associates, PLLC, Michael Hore, Robert Hunt, Ernest Martinez, II, Arnaldo Monge, Rhonda O'Rourke, #10 MOTION to Dismiss by Federal Insurance Company KCPA Claim filed by J. Smith Lanier & Co., Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC, John K. Milward, John B. Milward. (Mussler, Christopher)
June 16, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Stewart Brown, II, Kenneth Canterbury, Luke Fallon, HDM Holdings, Inc., HDM Pharmacy, LLC, Hagyard-Davison-McGee Associates, PLLC, Michael Hore, Robert Hunt, Ernest Martinez, II, Arnaldo Monge, Rhonda O'Rourke filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Complaint from Breach of Contract Suit)(Barnette, Joshua)
June 15, 2020 NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD re #17 Disclosures was an INCORRECT PDF document filed as main document; Attorney has re-file the corrected Disclosures at DE #18 . *CBD* cc: COR (SLH)
June 12, 2020 Filing 18 DISCLOSURES by Hagyard-Davison-McGee Associates, PLLC.(Bass, Elizabeth)
June 12, 2020 Filing 17 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCORRECT PDF PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 6/15/2020. Modified on 6/15/2020 (SLH).
June 12, 2020 Clerk's Note: re #17 Disclosures: Attorney Bass' assistant called to inform the clerk that the incorrect document was attached to this entry. (KJR)
June 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Benjamin Harris. #13 Motion to REmand to State Court, #14 Motion to Hold Pending Motions in Abeyance has been filed by HDM Holdings, Inc., HDM Pharmacy, LLC, Hagyard-Davison-McGee Associates, PLLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SLH) Modified text on 6/8/2020 (SLH).
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Pltf's #14 MOTION to Hold Pending Motions in Abeyance is GRANTED. Federals #9 Motion to Dismiss Chubb Defendants and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs KCPA claim #10 are held in abeyance until further orders of this Court. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/4/2020. (SLH)cc: COR
June 4, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #14 MOTION to Hold Pending Motions in Abeyance by Stewart Brown, II, Kenneth Canterbury, Luke Fallon, HDM Holdings, Inc., HDM Pharmacy, LLC, Hagyard-Davison-McGee Associates, PLLC, Michael Hore, Robert Hunt, Ernest Martinez, II, Arnaldo Monge, Rhonda O'Rourke, Kevin Pfieste (SLH)
June 3, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Hold Pending Motions in Abeyance by Stewart Brown, II, Kenneth Canterbury, Luke Fallon, HDM Holdings, Inc., HDM Pharmacy, LLC, Hagyard-Davison-McGee Associates, PLLC, Michael Hore, Robert Hunt, Ernest Martinez, II, Arnaldo Monge, Rhonda O'Rourke, Kevin Pfiester, Jeffrey Pumphrey, Dwayne Rodgerson, James Schalnus, Nathan Slovis, Michael Spirito, Benjamin Stivers, Karen Wolfsdorf (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walters, John) Modified text on 6/4/2020 (SLH).
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Stewart Brown, II, Kenneth Canterbury, Luke Fallon, HDM Holdings, Inc., HDM Pharmacy, LLC, Hagyard-Davison-McGee Associates, PLLC, Michael Hore, Robert Hunt, Ernest Martinez, II, Arnaldo Monge, Rhonda O'Rourke, Kevin Pfiester, Jeffrey Pumphrey, Dwayne Rodgerson, James Schalnus, Nathan Slovis, Michael Spirito, Benjamin Stivers, Karen Wolfsdorf (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Stuart Brown II, #2 Proposed Order)(Harris, Benjamin)
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J. Smith Lanier & Co., Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC. (Mussler, Christopher)
May 15, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #6 Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures - No Disclosure Statement filed. (JJ)
May 13, 2020 Filing 11 FIRST ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by J. Smith Lanier & Co., Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC, John K. Milward, John B. Milward.(Mussler, Christopher)
May 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Federal Insurance Company KCPA Claim (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnette, Joshua)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Federal Insurance Company Chubb Defendants (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnette, Joshua)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by Federal Insurance Company.(Barnette, Joshua)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Ernest Martinez, II, Dwayne Rodgerson, Luke Fallon, Kenneth Canterbury, Hagyard-Davison-McGee Associates, PLLC, Stewart Brown, II, Michael Spirito, Robert Hunt, Michael Hore, James Schalnus, Nathan Slovis, HDM Pharmacy, LLC, Rhonda O'Rourke, Benjamin Stivers, Jeffrey Pumphrey, Karen Wolfsdorf, Arnaldo Monge, Kevin Pfiester, HDM Holdings, Inc..(Harris, Benjamin)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Christopher M. Mussler. #5 Answer to Complaint has been filed by J. Smith Lanier & Co. and Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JJ)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by J. Smith Lanier & Co., Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC, John K. Milward, John B. Milward.(Mussler, Christopher)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb JNA Holdings, Inc. for Federal Insurance Company.. (Barnette, Joshua)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Joshua F. Barnette. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Federal Insurance Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SLH)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-01118. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4653329), filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Federal Policy, #2 Exhibit B- Walter's 9/19/19 letter, #3 Exhibit C- Gassman's 9/19/19 letter, #4 Exhibit D- State Court Record, #5 Exhibit F- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLH)
April 23, 2020 Conflict Check run. (SLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagyard-Davison-McGee Associates , PLLC et al v. Chubb Group of Insurance Companies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Stivers
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDM Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stewart Brown, II
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnaldo Monge
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Schalnus
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hore
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Fallon
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Canterbury
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hagyard-Davison-McGee Associates, PLLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Spirito
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Pfiester
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Wolfsdorf
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Rodgerson
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Pumphrey
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Slovis
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hunt
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Martinez, II
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDM Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda O'Rourke
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Benjamin T. Harris
Represented By: John W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chubb Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Group of Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua F. Barnette
Represented By: Matthew W. Breetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Smith Lanier & Co.
Represented By: Christopher M. Mussler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B. Milward
Represented By: Christopher M. Mussler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Mussler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John K. Milward
Represented By: Christopher M. Mussler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?