Thornberry v. Powell County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Mindy Thornberry
Defendant: Powell County Detention Center, David Howard, Robert King, James Anderson and Travis Crabtree
Case Number: 5:2020cv00271
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by James Anderson, Travis Crabtree, David Howard, Robert King, Powell County Detention Center (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Wright, Derrick)
July 23, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Andre Regard re #5 Amended Complaint, Error: attachments were insufficiently described as Exhibit 1, Exhibit 2 Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit 1 Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (SLH)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the defendant's #4 MOTION to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/23/2020.(KM)cc: COR
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss by James Anderson, Travis Crabtree, David Howard, Robert King, Powell County Detention Center filed by Mindy Thornberry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Regard, Andre)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Mindy Thornberry. FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit- email exchange between S. Ratliff and D.Howard, #2 Exhibit- text messages between multiple coworkers, #3 Exhibit- text messages from D. Howard, #4 Exhibit- email re returning to work, #5 Exhibit- email from DOC, #6 Exhibit- messages from Powell Co. Health Dept. and Office of Public Information)(Regard, Andre) Modified text on 7/23/2020 (SLH).
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by James Anderson, Travis Crabtree, David Howard, Robert King, Powell County Detention Center (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Wright, Derrick)
June 25, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James Anderson, Travis Crabtree, David Howard, Robert King, Powell County Detention Center. (JJ)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Powell Co. Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00092. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4704617), filed by James Anderson, Powell County Detention Center, Robert King, Travis Crabtree, David Howard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #4 Order Transfering from Fayette Circuit to Powell Circuit, #5 State Court Record - Fayette Circuit Court, #6 State Court Record - Powell Circuit Court)(JJ) Modified file date on 6/25/2020 (JJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornberry v. Powell County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powell County Detention Center
Represented By: Derrick T. Wright
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Howard
Represented By: Derrick T. Wright
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert King
Represented By: Derrick T. Wright
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Anderson
Represented By: Derrick T. Wright
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Crabtree
Represented By: Derrick T. Wright
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mindy Thornberry
Represented By: Andre F. Regard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?