Travelers Indemnity Company of America v. Tew et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Defendant: Bernard Tew, Tew LP, Vincent Tew, Stephanie Tew and Andrea Tew
Case Number: 5:2020cv00292
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER STAYING CASE pending the termination of the automatic stay imposed by Defendants Bernard Tew, Andrea Tew, and Tew, LP's bankruptcy proceedings. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/13/20.(JLM)cc: COR
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #9 Status Report (JLM)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Travelers Indemnity Company of America. (Keller, Stephen)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Notice filed by Andrea Tew, Tew LP, Bernard Tew: (1) Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362, this matter is STAYED, insofar as it pertains to Defendants Bernard Tew, Andrea Tew, and Tew, LP; (2) On or before August 12, 2020, the Parties shall file a joint status report indicating whether all named Defendants have been served and whether the Parties believe it would be efficient or preferable to continue forward with Defendants Vincent Tew and Stephanie Tew, who are not subject to the bankruptcy stay, or whether this entire action should be held in abeyance during the pendency of the bankruptcy proceedings; and (3) No later than fourteen (14) days after the termination of the automatic stay in either Bernard Tew and Andrea Tew's bankruptcy proceeding or Tew, LPs bankruptcy proceeding, the Parties shall file a joint status report with the Court. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/30/20.(JLM)cc: COR
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Attorney Update. Attorney Kellie Marie Collins,Justin Peterson,Taylor Margaret Shepherd for Andrea Tew,Kellie Marie Collins,Justin Peterson,Taylor Margaret Shepherd for Bernard Tew,Kellie Marie Collins,Justin Peterson,Taylor Margaret Shepherd for Tew LP added. (JLM)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #7 Notice of Bankruptcy (JLM)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Andrea Tew, Bernard Tew, Tew LP Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bernard and Andrea Voluntary Bankruptcy Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Tew LLP Voluntary Bankruptcy Petition)(Collins, Kellie)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Tew LP c/o SV Holdings, LLC on 07/11/2020, filed by Travelers Indemnity Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Proof of Service)(Keller, Stephen)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrea Tew, Bernard Tew, Stephanie Tew, Vincent Tew, Tew LP; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JLM)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING by Travelers Indemnity Company of America re Notice of Deficiency,, (Attachments: #1 Summons - Andrea Tew, #2 Summons - Bernard Tew, #3 Summons - Stephanie Tew, #4 Summons - Tew LP, #5 Summons - Vincent Tew)(Keller, Stephen)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Indemnity Company of America identifying Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate The Phoenix Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Other Affiliate The Travelers Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate The Travelers Idemnity Company for Travelers Indemnity Company of America.. (JLM)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4714189), filed by Travelers Indemnity Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - SDNY Complaints, #2 Exhibit 2 - Insurance Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (JLM)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Michael S. Maloney: re #1 [Complaint]; attorney notified clerk the summons should be returned electronically; however, a prepared summons was not attached to the electronic filing of the complaint in the fictitious miscellaneous case number 20 -99999. A summons may be issued by presenting the prepared summons to the Clerk for issuance by electronically filing a document entitled Notice of Filing with the prepared summons as an attachment within 7 calendar days. cc: COR (JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Indemnity Company of America v. Tew et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Tew
Represented By: Justin Peterson
Represented By: Kellie Marie Collins
Represented By: Taylor Margaret Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tew LP
Represented By: Justin Peterson
Represented By: Kellie Marie Collins
Represented By: Taylor Margaret Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Tew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Tew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Tew
Represented By: Justin Peterson
Represented By: Kellie Marie Collins
Represented By: Taylor Margaret Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Represented By: Stephen Keller
Represented By: Michael S. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?