Christian v. Altaire Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lucinda Christian
Defendant: Altaire Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC and Amazon Retail LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00306
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Altaire Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bertram, Catherine)
August 28, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Amazon Retail LLC, Amazon.com Services LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Stopher, Edward)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucinda Christian via Certified Mail to Altaire Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Return)(Herren, Thomas)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Altaire Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amazon Retail LLC, Amazon.com Services LLC, filed by Lucinda Christian.(JJ)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM ORDER: 1. The plaintiff's motion for leave to amend [Record No. #9 ] is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to filed the First Amended Complaint [Record No. #9 -3] previously tendered. 2. The defendants' pending motion to dismiss the original complaint [Record No. #5 ] is DENIED, as moot. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/14/2020.(JJ)cc: COR
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Amazon Retail LLC, Amazon.com Services LLC , #9 MOTION to File First Amended Complaint by Lucinda Christian filed by Amazon Retail LLC, Amazon.com Services LLC. (Stopher, Edward)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING by Lucinda Christian re #9 MOTION to File First Amended Complaint by Lucinda Christian (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Herren, Thomas)
August 7, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Thomas K. Herren re #8 Response to Motion, #9 MOTION to File First Amended Complaint by Lucinda Christian; Error 1: Error: This is a motion AND a response. The document was filed only as a response when the document should be filed as two separate entries; Entry by attorney; Clerk re-filed the document as a Motion #9 . In the future, when filing multiple documents within one filing, please refer to the ECF User Manual Filing Other Types of Documents for the correct procedure. No further steps required by counsel as to Error 1. Error 2: attorney failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing", file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR (JJ)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to File First Amended Complaint by Lucinda Christian. Filed pursuant to QC re DE #8 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - FDA Recall, #3 Tendered First Amended Complaint)(JJ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2020: #4 Proposed Order) (JJ).
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Amazon Retail LLC, Amazon.com Services LLC and Motion to File First Amended Complaint filed by Lucinda Christian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - FDA Recall, #3 Exhibit Tendered First Amended Complaint)(Herren, Thomas)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Altaire Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JJ)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING by Lucinda Christian Issue Summons (Herren, Thomas)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Amazon Retail LLC, Amazon.com Services LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Greer, Todd)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amazon Retail LLC, Amazon.com Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Amazon Retail LLC, Amazon.com Services LLC.. (Stopher, Edward)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Edward Stopher. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Amazon Retail LLC, Amazon.com Services LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (STC)
July 15, 2020 Conflict Check run. (STC)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-90129. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4722198), filed by Amazon Retail LLC, Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(STC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian v. Altaire Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altaire Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By: Todd P. Greer
Represented By: Edward H. Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Retail LLC
Represented By: Todd P. Greer
Represented By: Edward H. Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda Christian
Represented By: Thomas K. Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?