Smith v. United States of America et al
Petitioner: Joseph Gerald Smith
Respondent: United States of America and Warden Quintana
Case Number: 5:2020cv00314
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #2 Case Transferred, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (STC)
July 21, 2020 Conflict Check run. (STC)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(STC)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Michigan Eastern. Case number 2:20-cv-11869. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. cc: Petitioner w/ copy of docket sheet
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Kentucky. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (DPer) [Transferred from mied on 7/21/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joseph Gerald Smith against Quintana, United States of America, Receipt No: 130781 - Fee: $ 5. (DAll) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #1 Coversheet) (DAll). [Transferred from mied on 7/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Gerald Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?