J.T. v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: J.T.
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Paul Miller Ford, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00318
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1446 pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: 1. Each party bear it's own costs and fees. 2. All claims against defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 3. All pending motions DENIED AS MOOT. 4. Clerk STRIKE THIS MATTER FROM COURT'S DOCKET. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/10/2021.(GLD)cc: COR,D,JC
March 10, 2021 Filing 22 Proposed Agreed Order /Stipulation of Dismissal by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keal, R.)
December 23, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #21 MOTION for Leave to File by J.T. To File First Amended Complaint (GLD)
November 30, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File by J.T. To File First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Attachment First Amended Complaint, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Order)(Turner, James) Modified referral on 12/4/2020 (JLM).
November 10, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by J.T. Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production (Tracy, E.)
October 16, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by J.T. RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION (Tracy, E.)
September 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF FILING by J.T. of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Subpoena)(Turner, James)
September 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF FILING by J.T. of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Subpoena)(Turner, James)
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of Service of Initial Disclosures (Keal, R.)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by J.T. of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure (Tracy, E.)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: 1. All discovery disputes REFERRED to magistrate judge, assigned by random draw (Magistrate Judge Stinnett). No motion to compel or other motions unless counsel have conferred. 2. Court encourages early and economic case resolution. Parties SHALL immediately assess potential for agreement resolution. If request settlement conference, parties shall file joint motion. 3. Complete initial disclosures by 9/14/2020. 4. All motions to amend pleadings and to join additional parties filed by 12/15/2020. 5. Complete all discovery by 4/30/2021. 6. Plaintiff shall provide expert rules by 1/25/2021. Defendant shall provide expert reports by 3/1/2021. 7. Dispositive Motions, including Daubert motions, filed by 5/3/2021. 8. All motions for extensions of time or to modify this scheduling order shall be referred to the undersigned for disposition. The parties are advised in advance that such motions are disfavored. 9. Scope of discovery and the parties' obligations in discovery are governed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as set forth in Order. 10. Motion practice shall be governed by Local Rule 7.1 except as otherwise provided in this order. 11. At least 10 days prior to final pretrial conference, counsel shall: a. file list of exhibits; b. Premark and display to opposing counsel all exhibits; c. file witness list; d. all objections waived unless raised before or at final pretrial conference; e. file pretrial brief with facts of case. f. file agreed proposed jury instructions and submit copy to chambers e-mail. 12. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 7/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood. Parties shall be prepared to discuss settlement. 13. JURY TRIAL set for 8/10/2021 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood (8 days). Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/27/2020.(GLD)cc: COR,D,JC
August 25, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (GLD)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Keal, R.)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Wendell P. Martens as counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/5/2020. (GLD)cc: COR, Wendell P. Martens via U.S. Mail
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew G. Counts as counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/5/2020. (GLD)cc: COR
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice E. Todd Tracy for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/5/2020. (GLD)cc: COR
August 3, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to E. Todd Tracy, Andrew G. Counts, Wendell P. Martens, Jr re #6 MOTION for Andrew G. Counts to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J.T. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4737394), #7 MOTION for Wendell P. Martens to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J.T. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4737398), #5 MOTION for E. Todd Tracy to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J.T. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4737386). (GLD)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING by J.T. re #6 MOTION for Andrew G. Counts to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J.T. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4737394) ECF Compliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF Compliance)(Turner, James)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Wendell P. Martens to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J.T. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4737398) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Texas Bar Cert., #3 Exhibit KY Bar Receipt, #4 Exhibit ECF Compliance)(Turner, James)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Andrew G. Counts to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J.T. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4737394) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Texas Bar Cert., #3 Exhibit KY Bar Receipt)(Turner, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2020: #4 ECF registration form) (GLD).
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for E. Todd Tracy to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J.T. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4737386) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Texas Bar Cert., #3 Exhibit ECF Compliance, #4 Exhibit KY Bar Receipt, #5 Exhibit Reprimand statement)(Turner, James)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) parties meet within 21 days; exchange disclosures; (2) Rule 26 Meeting Report due within 10 days thereafter.. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/27/20.(KJR)cc: COR
July 23, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #1 Notice of Removal, Answer (GLD)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ford Motor Company. (GLD)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-1438. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4729549), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet attachment, #3 State Court Record, #4 Answer, #5 Amended Answer by Ford, #6 State Court Record Order filed 7/3/2020, #7 State Court Record Order filed 6/22/2020, #8 State Court Record Order Dismissing Paul Miller Ford filed 7/7/2020, #9 State Court Record Order filed 5/26/2020)(GLD)
July 22, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. Filed in State Court Record #1 .(GLD)
July 22, 2020 Conflict Check run. (GLD)
July 22, 2020 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. Filed in State Court Record #1 . (GLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.T. v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Paul F. Malek
Represented By: R. Thaddeus Keal
Represented By: Derek Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Miller Ford, Inc.
Represented By: Carroll M. Redford, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.T.
Represented By: James Ryan Turner
Represented By: Andrew G. Counts
Represented By: Wendell P. Martens, Jr.
Represented By: E. Todd Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?