World Heritage Animal Genomic Resources et al v. Stull et al
Plaintiff: World Heritage Animal Genomic Resources and Lucinda Christian
Defendant: Phillip Stull, Brenda Stull, Patricia Stull and Alton H. Stull, Sr.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00334
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER: 1. Plaintiff's #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order DENIED AS MOOT. 2. Hearing scheduled 8/18/2020 is CANCELED. 3. The plaintiffs Complaint #1 is DISMISSED, without prejudice, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. This matter is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the docket. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/14/2020.(GLD)cc: COR,D,DEFENDANTS
August 14, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #8 Response to Order to Show Cause (JLM)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Lucinda Christian, World Heritage Animal Genomic Resources #7 filed by Lucinda Christian, World Heritage Animal Genomic Resources. (Astorino, Rob)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER:1. Plaintiff's WHAGR is directed to SHOW CAUSE on or before 8/14/2020 why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; 2. A MOTION HEARING on plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief #6 is set for 8/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves; 3. Counsel for the plaintiffs are DIRECTED to provide notice to the defendants of the date & time of the hearing. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to provide the best notice practical to the defendant, whose identities and contact information appear in the summons issued in the matter. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/6/2020.(KM)cc: COR,D, and Alton Stull, Brenda Stull, Phillip Stull, Partricia Stull by US Mail Modified text on 8/6/2020 (KM).
August 6, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by World Heritage Animal Genomic Resources (KJR)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by World Heritage Animal Genomic Resources (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit affidavit of lucinda christian, #3 Affidavit affidavit of rob astorino jr., #4 Exhibit exhibit 1 letters of alvorado and johnson, #5 Exhibit exhibit 2 signed lease and purchase agreement, #6 Exhibit exhibit 3 unsigned purchase agreement, #7 Exhibit exhibit 4 unsigned lease, #8 Exhibit exhibit 5 usda lease rates, #9 Exhibit exhibit 6 uk salmonella report, #10 Exhibit exhibit 7 june 16 letter, #11 Exhibit exhibit 8 july 2 letter, #12 Exhibit exhibit 9 july 17 letter, #13 Exhibit exhibit 10 july 31 eviction letter)(Astorino, Rob)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alton H. Stull, Sr, Brenda Stull, Patricia Stull, Phillip Stull; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Brenda Stull, #2 Summons Phillip Stull, #3 Summons Patricia Stull)(MDC)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by World Heritage Animal Genomic Resources re #3 Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures, (Astorino, Rob)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Rob Lawrence Astorino, Jr. and Matthew W. Stein has been filed by World Heritage Animal Genomic Resources without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (MDC)
July 31, 2020 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4737759), filed by World Heritage Animal Genomic Resources, Lucinda Christian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Alton Stull, #3 Summons Brenda Stull, #4 Summons Phillip Stull, #5 Summons Patricia Stull)(MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: World Heritage Animal Genomic Resources et al v. Stull et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Stull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Stull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Stull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alton H. Stull, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: World Heritage Animal Genomic Resources
Represented By: Rob Lawrence Astorino, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew W. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda Christian
Represented By: Rob Lawrence Astorino, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew W. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?