Quill v. Attorney General et al
Plaintiff: Sophia J. Quill
Defendant: John Does 1-100, Attorney General, State of Kentucky and USA
Respondent: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Case Number: 5:2020cv00348
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sophia J. Quill. The Court DIRECTS the Commonwealth to respond, addressing only the jurisdictional question, no later than October 30, 2020. As a part of its response, Respondent SHALL attach any available documentation or records pertaining to the challenged convictions. The matter will then stand submitted to the Court for further review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 10/02/20.(JLM)cc: COR and Sophia J. Quill by US Mail
September 22, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett for review: #8 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (GLD)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Sophia J. Quill, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, no postmark)(GLD)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to mail Quill a copy of this order and a blank 2254 form; 2. If Quill intends to challenge the Kentucky state convictions/sentences, she SHALL complete the 2254 form and return the completed form to the Clerk no later than 10/8/2020; 3. If Quill does not timely return the completed 2254 form, the Court would anticipate recommending dismissal of the pending petition, without prejudice, as improperly filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 9/8/2020.(KM)cc: COR and Sophia Quill by US Mail
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Petitioner's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Quill may proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 8/21/2020. (KM)cc: COR and Sophia Quill via U.S. mail
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JJ)
August 17, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sophia Quill (JJ)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Sophia Quill. (JJ)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sophia Quill, pro se. Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sophia Quill)(JJ)
August 17, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Sophia Quill, pro se. Petition filed on 2255 Motion to Vacate form. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope - No post date)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quill v. Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia J. Quill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?