Amwear USA, Inc. v. Galls, LLC
Plaintiff: Amwear USA, Inc.
Defendant: Galls, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00354
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Andrew Kim re #17 MOTION for Andrew Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Galls, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4790539). (MDC)
October 2, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Jacob Raver re #18 MOTION for Jacob Raver to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Galls, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4790547). (MDC)
October 2, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Roberto M. Braceras re #16 MOTION for Roberto M. Braceras to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Galls, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4790519). (MDC)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #16 , #17 and #18 Motion for Attys Roberto M. Braceras, Andrew Kim, and Jacob Raver Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dft Galls, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 10/02/2020. (MDC)cc: COR and Andrew Kim, Jacob Raver and Roberto Braceras by US Mail (Order + Atty Registration Form)
October 1, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Jacob Raver to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Galls, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4790547)Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Strong, Adrianne)
October 1, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Andrew Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Galls, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4790539)Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Strong, Adrianne)
October 1, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Roberto M. Braceras to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Galls, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4790519)Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Strong, Adrianne)
October 1, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Galls, LLC , MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint by Galls, LLC Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - California Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Annual Supply Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - May 11, 2020 letter, #4 Proposed Order)(Strong, Adrianne)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Galls, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Galls Intermediate Holdings, LLC for Galls, LLC.. (Strong, Adrianne)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED ORDER: Parties' #12 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer is GRANTED. Galls shall respond to the Pla's #1 Complaint on or by 10/01/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 09/03/2020. (MDC) cc: COR
September 3, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins for review: re #12 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Galls, LLC (MDC)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Galls, LLC Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strong, Adrianne) Modified Filers on 9/3/2020 (MDC).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Pla's #9 Motion for Daniel L. Rasmussen to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 08/26/2020. (MDC) cc: COR and Daniel L. Rasmussen by US Mail (Order + Atty E-filing Registration Form)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING by Amwear USA, Inc. re #9 MOTION for Daniel L. Rasmussen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amwear USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4756850) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Dilger, Craig)
August 26, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Craig Christman Dilger re #9 MOTION for Daniel L. Rasmussen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amwear USA, Inc. Attorney failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled Notice of Filing, file the Notice using the event Notice of Filing, attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR (MDC)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Daniel L. Rasmussen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amwear USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4756850)Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Attachment CA Good Standing)(Dilger, Craig)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Galls, LLC c/o The Corporation Trust Company, as Registered Agent on 08/20/2020, filed by Amwear USA, Inc.. (Dilger, Craig)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amwear USA, Inc.. (Dilger, Craig)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier. (MDC)cc: COR
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Craig Christman Dilger. #1 Complaint has been filed by Amwear USA, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (MDC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Galls, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (MDC)
August 18, 2020 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4751924), filed by Amwear USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Annual Supply Agreement, #2 Summons Galls, LLC, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amwear USA, Inc. v. Galls, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galls, LLC
Represented By: Jacob Raver
Represented By: Roberto M. Braceras
Represented By: Adrianne C. Strong
Represented By: Andrew Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amwear USA, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. French
Represented By: Craig Christman Dilger
Represented By: Daniel L. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?