A.A. et al v. Texas Eastern Transmission, LP et al
Plaintiff: A.A. and A.D.H.
Defendant: John Doe(s), Texas Eastern Transmission, LP, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, NDT Global LLC, Spectra Energy Corp., NDT Systems & Services (America) Inc., Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, NDT Services & Systems, LLC, Michael B. Clem and Enbridge (U.S.), Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00375
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 15 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enbridge (U.S.), Inc., Spectra Energy Corp., Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Robinson, D.)
October 26, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, D. Christopher Robinson. #5 Answer to Amended Complaint, has been filed by Enbridge (U.S.), Inc., Spectra Energy Corp., Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SLH)
October 23, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by A.A.(a minor) filed by Spectra Energy Corp., Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Preliminary Report, #2 Exhibit B - Email, #3 Exhibit C - Fire Dept. Records, #4 Proposed Order)(Robinson, D.)
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by NDT Global LLC, NDT Services & Systems, LLC filed by Enbridge (U.S.), Inc., Spectra Energy Corp., Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NDT America's Certificate of Dissolution & Termination, #2 Exhibit 2 - PHMSA Second Amended Corrective Order)(Robinson, D.)
October 21, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Christopher Tucker re #11 Response to Motion; Error: attachments were insufficiently described as Exhibit. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit (incorrect); Exhibit A: Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required bycounsel. cc: COR (SLH)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by NDT Global LLC, NDT Services & Systems, LLC filed by A.A.(a minor). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit- Letter from Hon. Christopher Robinson, #2 Exhibit- Court's Order (Case No. 5:20-cv-96-JMH) )(Tucker, Christopher) Modified text on 10/21/2020 (SLH).
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by A.A.(a minor) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Tucker, Christopher)
October 2, 2020 Conflict Check run. (SLH)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by NDT Global LLC, NDT Services & Systems, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Ramsey, Ian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NDT Global LLC, NDT Services & Systems, LLC. (Ramsey, Ian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian T. Ramsey on behalf of NDT Global LLC, NDT Services & Systems, LLC (Ramsey, Ian)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, by Michael B. Clem.(Jones, Ernest)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, by Enbridge (U.S.), Inc., Spectra Energy Corp., Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, LP.(Robinson, D.)
September 25, 2020 Judge Joseph M. Hood added. Judge Karen K. Caldwell no longer assigned to case. (SLH)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Joseph M. Hood, United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/25/2020.(SLH)cc: COR
September 4, 2020 AMENDED COMPLAINT (NOTICE OF REMOVAL) against Michael B. Clem, John Doe(s)(Sued as "Unknown Corporate Defendants"), John Doe(s)(Sued as "Unknown Danville Compressor Station Operator(s)), Enbridge (U.S.), Inc., NDT Global LLC, NDT Services & Systems, LLC, NDT Systems & Services (America) Inc., Spectra Energy Corp., Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, LP, filed by A.A.(a minor), A.A.(a minor). (Filed at DE #1 in Exhibit A - State Court File).(KM)
September 4, 2020 Conflict Check run. (KM)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Eastern Transmission, LP identifying Corporate Parent Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Corporate Parent Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Enbridge, Inc. for Texas Eastern Transmission, LP.. (KM)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lincoln County Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-195. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4768036), filed by Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Kelly Gray, #3 Exhibit C - Delaware Certificate of Dissolution, #4 Exhibit D - Termination of Registration, #5 Exhibit E - Consent to Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(KM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.A. et al v. Texas Eastern Transmission, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.A.
Represented By: Christopher James Tucker
Represented By: James Hadden Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.D.H.
Represented By: Christopher James Tucker
Represented By: James Hadden Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Eastern Transmission, LP
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDT Global LLC
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Ian T. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Energy Corp.
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDT Systems & Services (America) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDT Services & Systems, LLC
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Ian T. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Clem
Represented By: Ernest H. Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enbridge (U.S.), Inc.
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?