Maupin v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Joyce Maupin
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00381
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: 1) Dft's #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Warren Sebastian von Schleicher is GRANTED; and 2) Warren Sebastian von Schleicher is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Dft Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/06/2020. (MDC) cc: COR
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Life Inc. for Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company.. (von Schleicher, Warren)
November 2, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #6 MOTION for Warren Sebastian von Schleicher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4816009) (JLM)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Warren von Schleicher has been filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLM)
November 2, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Warren von Schleicher re #6 MOTION for Warren Sebastian von Schleicher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4816009). (JLM)
October 31, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company.(von Schleicher, Warren)
October 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren von Schleicher on behalf of Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (von Schleicher, Warren)
October 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Warren Sebastian von Schleicher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4816009) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Warren Sebastian von Schleicher, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(von Schleicher, Warren)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED by Joyce Maupin: SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company COMPLETED on 10/2/2020. (SLH)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT from Secretary of State re #3 Summons Issued. (KM)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Kentucky Secretary of State. (SLH)
September 9, 2020 Conflict Check run. (SLH)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4771290), filed by Joyce Maupin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Denial letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company)(SLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maupin v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Maupin
Represented By: Josh Autry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Warren von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?