Eggerson v. Fayette County Detention Center et al
Petitioner: Octavious Eggerson and Octavious Louis Eggerson
Respondent: Matthew Albence, Director Farmer and Fayette County Detention Center
Case Number: 5:2020cv00445
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: #11 Filing Fee Received (SLH)
December 15, 2020 Filing 11 HABEAS Filing fee received - $ 5, receipt number 5031320 (SLH)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 1. Eggerson's #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED; 2. Eggerson must pay the $5 filing fee to the Clerk of the Court w/in 30 days of this Order. If he fails to do so, the Court will deny his petition w/out prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/7/2020. (SLH)cc: CORand Eggerson by US Mail
December 3, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Octavious Louis Eggerson, ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #7 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (SLH)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Octavious Louis Eggerson, pro se. (Attachments: #1 env postmarked 11/25/2020)(SLH)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Octavious Louis Eggerson, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 env postmarked 11/25/2020)(SLH)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus(IFP PENDING), filed by Octavious Louis Eggerson, pro se. (Attachments: #1 env postmarked 11/25/2020)(SLH)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1) Mr. Eggerson's #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2) Mr. Eggerson's #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED; 3) The Clerk of Court shall send Mr. Eggerson a Petition for Writ of Habeas Court, an Affidavit of Assets/IFP Application and a Certificate of Inmate Account; 4) W/in 30 days from the date of this Order, Mr. Eggerson must complete and file the habeas petition form, providing all of the facts relevant to his claims and stating the legal grounds for the relief he seeks; 5) W/in 30 days from the date of this Order, Mr. Eggerson must also either pay the $5.00 filing fee or (1) have the Certificate of Inmate Account [EDKY Form 523] certified by prison staff, (2) complete the Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis Application [Form AO-240], and (3) file both of them with the Court; and 6) The Court will deny the petition w/out prejudice if Mr. Eggerson does not take each of these required steps w/in 30 days. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/09/2020. (Attachments: #1 EDKy 521 Form, #2 AO-240 Form, #3 EDKy 523 Form) (MDC) cc: COR and Octavious Louis Eggerson by US Mail (Order + Forms)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: Eggerson via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 sample caption)(SLH)
November 4, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Octavious Eggerson, #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Octavious Eggerson, ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (SLH)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Octavious Eggerson, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Env- postmark illegible)(SLH)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Octavious Eggerson, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Env- postmark illegible)(SLH)
November 3, 2020 Conflict Check run. (SLH)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (IFP PENDING), filed by Octavious Eggerson, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Env- postmark illegible)(SLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eggerson v. Fayette County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fayette County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Octavious Eggerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Octavious Louis Eggerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?