Reed v. Nelnet Diversified Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amber Reed
Defendant: Equifax Credit Information Services, LLC, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency doing business as Fed Loan Servicing Company and Nelnet Diversified Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00453
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency Completed on 11/18/2020. Secretary of State return states certified mail, return receipt. (KM)
December 7, 2020 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (Kenney, Jonathan)
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Jonathan Kenney. #7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KM)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency waiver sent on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Kenney, Jonathan)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (Kenney, Jonathan)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Emily H. Funk by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Admission Check)(KM)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: PDF DOCUMENT: Error: INCORRECT document attached to docket entry by docket clerk; Wrong Party Listed for service re #4 Summons Issued ; Correct document attached to this entry. *TDA* cc: COR (KM)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency; Summons issued and summons returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Secretary of State. (KM) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/10/2020) (TDA).
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Credit Information Services, LLC, Nelnet Diversified Solutions, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Nelnet Diversified)(KM)
November 10, 2020 Conflict Check run. (KM)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4824018), filed by Amber Reed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Nelnet Diversified Solutions, Inc., #3 Summons Equifax Information Services, LLC, #4 Summons Fed Loan Servicing Company)(KM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Nelnet Diversified Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Credit Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency doing business as Fed Loan Servicing Company
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet Diversified Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Reed
Represented By: Emily H. Funk
Represented By: David W. Hemminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?