UCB, Inc. et al v. Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL and Harris FRC Corporation
Defendant: Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc. and Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00038
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc. for proceedings held on 03/30/2021 - 03/30/201 before Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove.. (Greenwald, Bart)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC for proceedings held on March 30, 2021 before Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove.. (Hayden, Mark)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF FILING by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC re #52 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, Motion Hearing,, (Attachments: #1 Power point presentation)(Hayden, Mark)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on 3/30/2021 before Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove: Court having heard counsel ORDERS as follows: 1. Defendant's shall file their power point into the record. Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #48 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim are TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. An Order outlining specific rulings is forthcoming (Court Reporter Elaine Haberer.) Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. (GLD)cc: COR
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: Court ORDERS #47 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED. Attorney Ambrose Kevin O'Bryan terminated. Plaintiff represented by other attorneys of record. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/29/2021. (GLD)cc: COR
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: 1. Defendant's #46 MOTION for Telephonic Access to March 30, 2021 Preliminary Injunction Hearing is GRANTED. 2. Ms. Kleiner is PERMITTED to join the 3/30/2021 preliminary injunction hearing telephonically. 3. To join the teleconference, Ms. Kleiner is DIRECTED to call AT&T Teleconferencing at 1-877-336-1280 and enter Access Code 2086161 (followed by#), and, when requested, enter the Security Code 09170 (followed by #).. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/29/2021.(GLD)cc: COR
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: granting #44 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to Seal Document is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/29/2021. (GLD)cc: COR
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #47 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Harris FRC Corporation, Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc. for Ambrose K. O'Bryan (GLD)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Mark Hayden re #48 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6); Error: attachments were insufficiently described as Exhibit A, Exhibit B. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (GLD)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - NDCA Order, #3 Exhibit B - MDFL Order, #4 Proposed Order)(Hayden, Mark) Modified on 3/29/2021 (GLD).
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Harris FRC Corporation, Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc. for Ambrose K. O'Bryan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(O'Bryan, Ambrose)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #46 MOTION for Telephonic Access to March 30, 2021 Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC (GLD)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Telephonic Access to March 30, 2021 Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hayden, Mark)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Harris FRC Corporation, Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc., #44 MOTION for leave to Seal a Document #41 Order on Motion for leave to Seal Document, #36 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc. (GLD)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SEALED REPLY Memorandum in Support of #4 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc.. (Greenwald, Bart) Modified text on 3/18/2021 (GLD). Modified to Seal Per Order #49 on 3/29/2021 (GLD).
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for leave to Seal a Document #41 Order on Motion for leave to Seal Document, #36 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum min Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Under Seal)(Greenwald, Bart)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: denying as moot #32 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/15/21. (JLM)cc: COR
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SEALED UNREDACTED EXHIBITS RE #36 Response. Sealed pursuant to LEAVE OF COURT re #41 Order on Motion for leave to Seal Document by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Valazza, #2 Declaration of Customer A CEO, #3 Declaration of Preetty Haran, #4 Declaration of Josh Stephenson) (Hayden, Mark) Modified on 3/17/2021 (GLD).
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Dft's #35 Motion for leave to Seal Document is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/15/2021. (SLH)cc: COR
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #40 Status Report (JLM)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STATUS REPORT by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC. (Hayden, Mark)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that #38 Proposed Agreed Order is GRANTED and Plaintiff's must file reply by 3/17/2021 to #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/12/2021.(GLD)cc: COR
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #38 Proposed Agreed Order For Extension Of Time To File Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by UCB, Inc. (GLD)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Proposed Agreed Order For Extension Of Time To File Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC, Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Inc., Research Corporation Technologies, Inc. UCB, Inc.. (Duncan, Kevin) Modified on 3/12/2021 (GLD).
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David J. Wolfsohn. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/5/21. (JLM)cc: COR and David J. Wolfsohn (w/ecf form) by US Mail
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #35 MOTION for leave to Seal a Document by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC (GLD)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Harris FRC Corporation, Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc. (redacted) filed by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Valazza (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Preetty Haran (redacted), #3 Declaration of Josh Stephenson (redacted), #4 Declaration of CEO (redacted), #5 Declaration of Anthony J. Fitzpatrick)(Hayden, Mark)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for leave to Seal a Document by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Yevgenia Kleiner, #3 Proposed Order)(Hayden, Mark)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #30 Amended Document by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC filed by Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James Trainor, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Trainor Declaration, Telephonic Conference Transcript, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Trainor Declaration, Hayden Correspondence, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Trainor Declaration, Proposed Protective Order)(Greenwald, Bart)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's are DIRECTED to respond to #32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #30 Amended Document within 7 days. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/3/2021.(GLD)cc: COR
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #30 Amended Document by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC (GLD)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #30 Amended Document by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hayden, Mark)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc.. (Greenwald, Bart)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Amended Complaint by Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 551 Patent)(Greenwald, Bart) Modified on 2/25/2021 (GLD).
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: 1. Defendants' #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED. 2. Christopher S. Kroon and Anthony J. Fitzpatrick are admitted phv as counsel for defendants. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 2/19/2021. (GLD)cc: COR, Christopher S. Kroon and Anthony J. Fitzpatrick w/ECF registration form
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for David J. Wolfsohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4900373) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Hayden, Mark)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to David J. Wolfsohn re #28 MOTION for David J. Wolfsohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4900373). (GLD)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #28 MOTION for David J. Wolfsohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4900373) (GLD)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #24 MOTION for Christopher S. Kroon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4898634) (GLD)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to Christopher S. Kroon re #24 MOTION for Christopher S. Kroon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4898634). (GLD)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE held on 02/11/2021 before Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. Court Reporter: Sandra L. Wilder, Telephone number (859) 516-4114. Transcript ordered by: AMBROSE K. O'BRYAN and MARK T. HAYDEN. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must follow the Court's policy regarding the Redaction Responsibility of Counsel and Parties. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov. #Read this policy carefully. Sample forms, i.e., a Notice of Intent to Redact, may be found on the court website by clicking on #Local Forms. If there are no redactions requested, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available via PACER 90 days from today's date. The Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Redaction Request due 3/15/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2021.
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: 1. Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED. 2. Robert Counihan and James Trainor are admitted PHV as counsel for plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 2/17/2021. (GLD)cc: COR, Counihan w/ecf registration, Trainor w/ecf registration
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST of Telephonic Conference by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC for proceedings held on February 11, 2021 before Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove.. (Hayden, Mark)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Christopher S. Kroon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4898634) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Hayden, Mark)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 2/11/2021 before Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove: 1. Defendants shall have to 3/8/2021 by which to fil a response to the Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctions; 2. Plaintiffs have to 3/15/2021 to file their reply; 3. Upon filing of response & reply, a Preliminary Injunction Hearing will be scheduled by subsequent order. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. (Court Reporter Sandy Wilder.). Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 2/11/2021. (KM)cc: COR, James Trainor, Robert Counihan, Anthony Fitzpatrick by U.S. mail Modified text on 2/17/2021 (KM).
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: 1. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's re #5 MOTION for Hearing on Preliminary Injunction Motion is GRANTED. 2. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING set for 3/30/2021 at 11:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 2/17/2021.(GLD)cc: COR,D
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST of Telephonic Conference by Harris FRC Corporation, Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc. for proceedings held on 02/11/2021 before Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove.. (O'Bryan, Ambrose)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to Anthony J. Fitzpatrick re #20 MOTION for Anthony J. Fitzpatrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4898201). (GLD)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #20 MOTION for Anthony J. Fitzpatrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4898201) (GLD)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Anthony J. Fitzpatrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4898201) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Hayden, Mark)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: It is ORDERED as follows: 1. A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE shall be held 2/11/2021 at 11:00 AM in FRANKFORT before Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove; 2. To join the teleconference, the parties are DIRECTED to call AT&T Teleconferencing at 1-877-336-1280 and enter Access Code 2086161 (followed by #), and, when requested, enter the Security Code 09170 (followed by #).. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 2/10/2021.(KM)cc: COR, Frankfort Clerk
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Corp. Disclosure Statement, Mot. for Prelim. Inj., Brief in Supp. of Mot., Proposed Order, Declaration of Mike Davis, Declaration of Vincent Jose, Compl. for Patent Infringement served on Catalent Pharma Solutions, Inc. on 02/08/2021, filed by UCB, Inc.. (Greenwald, Bart)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Corp. Disclosure Statement, Mot. for Prelim. inj., Brief in Support of Mot., Proposed Order, Declaration of Mike Davis, Declaration of Vincent Jose and Complaint for Patent Infringement served on Catalent, Inc. on 02/08/2021, filed by UCB, Inc.. (Greenwald, Bart)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Mot. for Prelim. Inj. and Supporting Documents served on Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC on 02/08/2021, filed by UCB, Inc.. (Greenwald, Bart)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service served on Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC on 02/08/2021, filed by UCB, Inc.. (Greenwald, Bart)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC. (Hayden, Mark)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Hayden on behalf of Catalent Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC (Hayden, Mark)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRO HAC VICE Filing fee received - Robert Counihan - $ 125.00, receipt number 5031693 (GLD)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE Filing fee received - James Trainer - $ 125.00, receipt number 5031692 (GLD)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Harris FRC Corporation, Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc., #7 MOTION for James Trainor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Harris FRC Corporation, Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc., #6 MOTION for Robert Counihan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Harris FRC Corporation, Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc., #5 MOTION for Hearing by Harris FRC Corporation, Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc. (GLD)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to James Trainor, Robert Counihan re #6 MOTION for Robert Counihan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Harris FRC Corporation, Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc., #7 MOTION for James Trainor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Harris FRC Corporation, Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc.. (GLD)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: PDF DOCUMENT: Error: INCORRECT document attached to docket entry by docket clerk; incorrect PDF attached re #9 Report Re: Patent/Trademark/Copy; Correct document attached to this entry. *stc* cc: COR (STC)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint, cc: form e-mailed to Register. (JER) (Main Document 9 replaced on 2/5/2021) (STC).
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Catalent, Inc., #2 Summons as to Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC)(JER)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for James Trainor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Harris FRC Corporation, Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Granting James Trainor Pro Hac Vice)(JER)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Robert Counihan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Harris FRC Corporation, Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Granting Robert Counihan Pro Hac Vice)(JER)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Harris FRC Corporation, Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Hearing)(JER)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Harris FRC Corporation, Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit A US Patent No. RE38,551, #4 Exhibit B Davis Declaration, #5 Exhibit C Jose Declaration, #6 Exhibit 1 to Jose Declaration)(JER)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent UCB S.A., Corporate Parent UCB Pharma S.A., Corporate Parent UCB, Inc. for UCB Biopharma SPRL; Corporate Parent UCB S.A., Corporate Parent UCB Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent UCB Finance N.V. for UCB, Inc... (JER)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4890902), filed by UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc., Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., Harris FRC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, US Patent No. RE38,551, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc., #4 Summons Catalent Inc., #5 Summons Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC, #6 Summons Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC)(JER)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: #5 MOTION for Hearing by Harris FRC Corporation, Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc. (JER)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY to James Trainor re #1 ; attorney failed to submit the appropriate $125 filing fee; within 7 calendar days, attorney shall submit the $125 filing fee to the Clerk. cc: COR (JER) Modified attorney name on 2/8/2021 (JER).
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY to Robert Counihan re #1 ; attorney failed to submit the appropriate $125 filing fee; within 7 calendar days, attorney shall submit the $125 filing fee to the Clerk. cc: COR (JER)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (JER)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Harris FRC Corporation, Research Corporation Technologies, Inc., UCB Biopharma SPRL, UCB, Inc. (JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UCB, Inc. et al v. Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Research Corporation Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Ambrose Kevin O'Bryan
Represented By: Robert Counihan
Represented By: James Trainor
Represented By: Kevin Todd Duncan
Represented By: Bart L. Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UCB, Inc.
Represented By: Ambrose Kevin O'Bryan
Represented By: Robert Counihan
Represented By: James Trainor
Represented By: Kevin Todd Duncan
Represented By: Bart L. Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UCB Biopharma SPRL
Represented By: Ambrose Kevin O'Bryan
Represented By: Robert Counihan
Represented By: James Trainor
Represented By: Kevin Todd Duncan
Represented By: Bart L. Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harris FRC Corporation
Represented By: Ambrose Kevin O'Bryan
Represented By: Robert Counihan
Represented By: James Trainor
Represented By: Kevin Todd Duncan
Represented By: Bart L. Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalent Inc.
Represented By: Mark T. Hayden
Represented By: Christopher S. Kroon
Represented By: Anthony J. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: David J. Wolfsohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalent Pharma Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Mark T. Hayden
Represented By: Christopher S. Kroon
Represented By: Anthony J. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: David J. Wolfsohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalent Pharma Solutions LLC
Represented By: Mark T. Hayden
Represented By: Christopher S. Kroon
Represented By: Anthony J. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: David J. Wolfsohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?