Merkley v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: James Merkley
Defendant: The Hartford Signet Jewelers Limited Appeals, Signet Jewelers Limited, The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv00039
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: 1) The #18 Stipulated Motion for Substitution of Party and Dismissal of Hartford Without prejudice is GRANTED. 2) Aetna Life Insurance Company is substituted as the Dft in place of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and The Hartford Signet Jewelers Limited Appeals. It remains the Pla's responsibility to effect service on Aetna Life Insurance Company. 3) Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and The Hartford Signet Jewelers Limited Appeals are DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. 4) The Clerk of Court is directed to amend the case caption to name Aetna Life Insurance Company in place of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, and to remove Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and The Harford Signet Jewelers Limited Appeals from the case caption. 5) The Unopposed #19 Motion for Additional time for responsive pleading to Pla's Complaint is DENIED as moot. 6) Dft Signet Jewelers Limited's #20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of time to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED. 7) Dft Signet Jewelers Limited SHALL have up to and including 04/27/2021 to answer or file a responsive pleading to complaint. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 04/02/2021. (MDC) cc: COR
April 2, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Boom for review: re #20 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Signet Jewelers Limited (JLM)
April 1, 2021 Filing 20 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Signet Jewelers Limited (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fuller, Adam)
April 1, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Claria H. Boom for review: re #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company , Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Additional Time for Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff& (KJR)
March 31, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company , Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Additional Time for Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(von Schleicher, Warren)
March 31, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Claria H. Boom for review: re #18 MOTION to Substitute Party by The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company , Stipulated Motion for Substitution of Party and Dismissal of Hartford without Prejudice (KJR)
March 30, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Substitute Party by The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company , Stipulated Motion for Substitution of Party and Dismissal of Hartford without Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(von Schleicher, Warren)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Adam D. Fuller. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 3/29/21. (JLM)cc: COR and Adam D. Fuller(w/ecf form) by US Mail
March 23, 2021 Filing 16 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Signet Jewelers Limited. (KJR)
March 23, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Adam D. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Signet Jewelers Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Adam D. Fuller, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 receipt, #4 Proposed Order)(KJR)
March 23, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam D. Fuller on behalf of Signet Jewelers Limited. (KJR)
March 23, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Adam D. Fuller re #15 MOTION for Adam D. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Signet Jewelers Limited. (KJR)
March 23, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Claria H. Boom for review: re #15 MOTION for Adam D. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Signet Jewelers Limited (KJR)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: GRANTING Warren Sebastian von Schleicher's #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 3/19/21. (KJR)cc: COR Modified text on 3/19/2021 (KJR).
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER: IT IS ORDERED as follow: 1. #10 The Stipulation for Additional Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint #10 is GRANTED; 2. The Defendant shall have until 3/31/2021 in which to file their responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 3/18/2021.(KM)cc: COR
March 17, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Claria H. Boom for review: re #10 Proposed Agreed Order and Stipulation for Additional Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, #7 MOTION for Warren Sebastian von Schleicher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4921730) (KJR)
March 17, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Warren von Schleicher re #7 MOTION for Warren Sebastian von Schleicher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4921730). (KJR)
March 16, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to Signet Jewelers Limited COMPLETED on 3/16/2021. Secretary of State return states RECEIVED on 02/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(MDC)
March 16, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Agreed Order and Stipulation for Additional Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(von Schleicher, Warren)
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc. for The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.. (von Schleicher, Warren)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren von Schleicher on behalf of The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (von Schleicher, Warren)
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Warren Sebastian von Schleicher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4921730) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Warren Sebastian von Schleicher, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(von Schleicher, Warren)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 DUPLICATED DE#5 SUMMONS RETURNED as to The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company: SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to Secretary of State return states served via certified mail return receipt requested on 2/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Greed Card Receipt)(KM) Modified text on 3/16/2021 (MDC).
March 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company COMPLETED on 3/16/2021. Secretary of State return states RECEIVED on 2/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(JLM)
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT to Secretary of State re #3 Summons Issued. (KJR)
February 8, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JER)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Hartford Signet Jewelers Limited Appeals; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Summons The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, #2 Summons Signet Jewelers Limited)(JER)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4891234), filed by James Merkley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons -The Hartford Signet Jewelers Limited Appeals, #3 Summons The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, #4 Summons Signet Jewelers Limited)(JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merkley v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Merkley
Represented By: Rob Lawrence Astorino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Signet Jewelers Limited Appeals
Represented By: Warren von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signet Jewelers Limited
Represented By: Adam D. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Warren von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Warren von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?