Wagner v. Abbott et al
Plaintiff: Michael W. Wagner, II
Defendant: Southeastern Emergency Services P.S.C., Team Health, LLC, Saint Joseph Health System, Inc doing business as Saint Joseph Hospital, Southeastern Emergency Physicians, LLC, Sarah P. Abbott, KentuckyOne Health, Inc., Laurie K. Doty and Southeastern Emergency Services, P.C.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00059
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court by Michael W. Wagner, II filed by Sarah P. Abbott, Laurie K. Doty, KentuckyOne Health, Inc., Saint Joseph Health System, Inc, Southeastern Emergency Physicians, LLC, Southeastern Emergency Services P.S.C., Team Health, LLC. (Barnett, Jeffery)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. Within 10 days from this date, parties shall exchange information required by Rule 26(a)(1); 2. Parties disclose all fact discovery NLT 8/2/2021; 3. NLT 6/1/2021, plaintiff disclose identity of expert witnesses. NLT 8/31/2011, defendants disclose same; 4. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due within 30 days of discovery of new information, but by NLT 30 days prior to close of discovery; 5. NTL 11/1/2021 parties complete all discovery; 6. Discover disputes referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge (Atkins) selected by random draw; 7. All motion for extension of time referred to undersigned for disposition. The parties are advised in advance that such motions are not favored and must be accompanied by a memorandum and affidavit of counsel outlining sufficient grounds for granting the relief sought; 8. Parties may not by agreement extend any of the deadlines set forth in this Scheduling Order or the deadlines for responding to motions; 9. Motions to Amended Pleadings and/or Join Additional Parties due by 6/1/2021; 10. Dispositive and daubert motions due by 12/1/2021; 11. By 3/21/2022, parties to file witness lists, exhibit lists, pretrial memorandum; 12. By 3/21/2022, parties pre-mark & number all exhibits & provide to opposing counsel; 13. By 3/21/2022, parties file Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions; 14. The above listed pretrial filing may be submitted to chambers by email; 16. NLT 4/4/2022, parties submit to chambers a copy of each exhibit; 17. JURY TRIAL set for 4/12/2022 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves, with counsel present at 8:30 a.m. (7 days); 18. Parties may request a pretrial conference if desired; 19. The parties are directed file a joint status report the first Monday of each month; 20. The parties are directed to use the service of a private mediator in the event they seek to mediate their dispute. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/7/2021.(KM)cc: COR,D,JC
April 7, 2021 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Barnett, Jeffery)
March 29, 2021 Filing 16 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court by Michael W. Wagner, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Pre-Trial Order, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stanton, Jordan) Modified text on 3/30/2021 (KJR).
March 17, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Team Health, LLC.(Long, Jason)
March 9, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Sarah P. Abbott, Laurie K. Doty.(Walter, Carl)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Team Health, LLC. (Long, Jason)
March 4, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Southeastern Emergency Physicians, LLC, Southeastern Emergency Services P.S.C..(Trevey, David)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. Rule 26(f) meeting w/in 30 days; 2. Exchange disclosures at time of meeting; 3. NLT 10 days after meeting, parties shall file a joint report containing information listed w/in Order. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 AO-85 Consent to MJ)(SLH)cc: COR
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by KentuckyOne Health, Inc., Saint Joseph Health System, Inc.(Barnett, Jeffery)
March 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Sarah P. Abbott, Laurie K. Doty of Consent to the removal (Walter, Carl). Modified text on 3/3/2021 (KJR).
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Team Health, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, of consent to and join in the Notice of Removal (Long, Jason). Modified text on 3/3/2021 (KJR).
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southeastern Emergency Physicians, LLC, Southeastern Emergency Services P.S.C. identifying affiliate of Team Health, LLC for Southeastern Emergency Physicians, LLC. (KJR)
March 1, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Answer to Complaint, Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (KJR)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Southeastern Emergency Physicians, LLC, Southeastern Emergency Services P.S.C. re #1 Notice of Removal, of Consent to Removal (Attachments: #1 Attachment 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Trevey, David)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY R. Scott Durham by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application. (KJR)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Sarah P. Abbott, Laurie K. Doty. (Walter, Carl)
February 26, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Sarah P. Abbott FILED IN STATE COURT SEE #1 . (JER)
February 26, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Southeastern Emergency Physicians, LLC, Southeastern Emergency Services P.S.C., Laurie K. Doty M.D. FILED IN STATE COURT SEE #1 . (JER) Modified added Laurie K. Doty on 2/26/2021 (JER).
February 26, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Team Health, LLC FILED IN STATE COURT SEE #1 . (JER)
February 26, 2021 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sarah P. Abbott, Laurie K. Doty, KentuckyOne Health, Inc., Saint Joseph Health System, Inc, Southeastern Emergency Physicians, LLC, Southeastern Emergency Services P.S.C., Team Health, LLC, filed by Michael W. Wagner, II FILED IN STATE COURT SEE #1 .(JER)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KentuckyOne Health, Inc., Saint Joseph Health System, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Commonspirit Health for KentuckyOne Health, Inc., Saint Joseph Health System, Inc.. (JER)
February 26, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review: #1 Notice of Removal, (JER)
February 26, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by KentuckyOne Health, Inc., Saint Joseph Health System, Inc. FILED IN STATE COURT SEE #1 .(JER)
February 26, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JER)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 19-ci-2790. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4906698), filed by Saint Joseph Health System, Inc, KentuckyOne Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3-Pleadings, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. Abbott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Emergency Services P.S.C.
Represented By: Melanie Sublett Marrs
Represented By: David A. Trevey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Team Health, LLC
Represented By: R. Scott Durham
Represented By: Jason H. Long
Represented By: Robert Scott Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Joseph Health System, Inc doing business as Saint Joseph Hospital
Represented By: Jeffery Todd Barnett
Represented By: Holly R. Iaccarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Emergency Physicians, LLC
Represented By: Melanie Sublett Marrs
Represented By: David A. Trevey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah P. Abbott
Represented By: Mark E. Nichols
Represented By: Carl W. Walter, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KentuckyOne Health, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffery Todd Barnett
Represented By: Holly R. Iaccarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie K. Doty
Represented By: Mark E. Nichols
Represented By: Carl W. Walter, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Emergency Services, P.C.
Represented By: Melanie Sublett Marrs
Represented By: David A. Trevey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Wagner, II
Represented By: Tyler S. Thompson
Represented By: Jordan A. Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?